Watkins, III v. Ledbetter, etal

Plaintiff: Eddie S Watkins, III
Defendant: William Ross, Jr., Taylor, Chad Ledbetter, Grice, Marsh, Hot Springs County Quorum Court Members and Kevin Abbott
Case Number: 6:2007cv06066
Filed: September 12, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 99 Report and Recommendations; Objections to R&R overruled; case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 15, 2010. (cnn)
March 16, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 64 Report and Recommendationsre; granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Chad Ledbetter, Marsh, Mike Taylor, William Ross, Jr., Robert Grice, Kevin Abbott. The mot ion is granted with respect to plaintiffs denial of medical care claim. The motion is denied with respect to plaintiffs claims that he was subjected to unconstitutional conditions of confinement. It is further Ordered that this matter is referred b ack to the Magistrate Judge for further disposition of Plaintiffs remaining claims that he was subjected to unconstitutional conditions of confinement. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 16, 2009. (dmc) Modified on 3/17/2009 edit text (dmc).
February 17, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chad Ledbetter, Marsh, Mike Taylor, William Ross, Jr., Robert Grice, Kevin Abbott. Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 17, 2009. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins, III v. Ledbetter, etal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Springs County Quorum Court Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie S Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?