Valor Healthcare, Inc. v. Pinkerton et al

Plaintiff: Valor Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant: Divinda Pinkerton, Kevin Hale, Healthstar Physicians of Hot Springs, PLLC and Healthstar, VA PLLC
Case Number: 6:2008cv06015
Filed: February 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Healthstar VA's counterclaim for defamation is dismissed with prejudice while its AUPA and RICO counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Valor's claim for defamation is dismissed with prejudice; denying as moot 104 Separate Defedants' Joint Objection and Motion to Strike; administratively terminating 96 Motion for Ext ension of Time to File Response/Reply. Valor has five (5) days from the date of this Order to show good cause for its failure to serve Joe Doe Defendants 1-5. Finally, Valor and Healthstar VA have ten (10) days from the date of this Order to provide briefing on the issue of whether the Arkansas Supreme Court would permit use of the federal Small Business Act as the standard for determining fraud and tortious interference with prospective advantage. This case remains set for trial on July 6, 2009. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 29, 2009. (cap)
December 23, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion to Dismiss; granting 70 Motion for Order. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 23, 2008. (dmc)
November 17, 2008 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 47 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. ; denying 49 Motion to Amend; finding as moot 56 Motion to Dismiss. A hearing remains scheduled in this case for November 26, 2008, at 11:00 a.m.. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 17, 2008. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valor Healthcare, Inc. v. Pinkerton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valor Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Luther O'Neal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divinda Pinkerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthstar Physicians of Hot Springs, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthstar, VA PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?