Jones v. Garland County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Antoine Zeno Jones
Defendant: Garland County Detention Center
Case Number: 6:2008cv06035
Filed: April 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Garland
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety for 43 Report and Recommendations, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 26, 2010. (dmc) Modified on 5/26/2010 to add text (dmc).
August 7, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, as to Plaintiff's claims of denial of medical care, excessive force claims and inadequate grievance procedure claims, and these claims are dismissed with prejudice. 14 . Defendants motion is denied as to Plaintiff's claim that he was subjected to unconstitutional conditions of confinement. Report and Recommendation is proper and is adopted in its entirety 20 . Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 7, 2009. (sh)
July 20, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Captain Steed, Larry Sanders, Deputy Dunn. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 20, 2009. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Garland County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Zeno Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?