Wochos v. Smith

Plaintiff: Wenzel Wochos
Defendant: Darrell - Smith
Case Number: 6:2008cv06070
Filed: July 16, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 33:1365 Environmental Matters

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: case dismissed pursuant to Rule 25(a) of FRCP. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 9, 2010. (cnn)
August 3, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 56 MOTION to Dismiss Case Due to Death of Plaintiff Wenzel Wochos filed by Darrell - Smith. Accordingly, this matter is removed from the September 27, 2010 trial docket, and will be stayed for a period of ninety (90) days. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 56 is denied as premature. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 3, 2010. (dmc)
May 20, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety for 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wenzel Wochos. Denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wenzel Wochos. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 20, 2010. (dmc)
September 11, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 16 Report and Recommendations; Denying 2 Motion for Emergency Order filed by Wenzel Wochos. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 11, 2008. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wochos v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenzel Wochos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell - Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?