Gregory v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Gregory R. Gregory
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2008cv06085
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Polk
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in toto the Magistrate's 15 Report and Recommendations and awarding plaintiff's attorney fees in the amount of $2123.50. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 22, 2009. (rw)
November 4, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 10 in its entirety and remands this case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 4, 2009. (dmc)
October 13, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Gregory R. Gregory. Objections to R&R due by 10/30/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 13, 2009. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Gregory
Represented By: Shannon Muse Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?