Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada v. Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada
Defendant: Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC
Counter_claimant: Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC
Counter_defendant: Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada
Case Number: 6:2008cv06100
Filed: November 8, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2011 304 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada against Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC in the amount of $861,275.35; in favor of Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada against Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC in the amount of $42,333.35; and in favor of Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC against Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada in the amount of $183,341.65. See judgment for specific information. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 12, 2011. (src)
July 28, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER re 270 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds (Southern Wine's Motion for Disbursement of Funds Deposited by Southern Wine into the Registry of the Court) filed by Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 28, 2010. (dmc)
June 30, 2010 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 239 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the jury's finding on Mountain Valley's Counterclaim for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing should be, and hereby is, set aside and held for naught. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 30, 2010. (dmc)
December 2, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff have judgment against defendant in the sum of Eight Hundred Sixty-one Thousand, Two Hundred Seventy-five and 35/100 Dollars ($861,275.35), plus postjudgment interest and preju dgment interest as specified below. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961, postjudgment interest is payable on all of the above sum, from the date this judgment is entered until the date this judgment is paid, at the rate of.27 %. Additionally, prej udgment interest is payable on the sum of 42,333.35 awarded to plaintiff for defendants failure to pay on an accounted stated, from September 12, 2007 until the date this judgment is entered, at the rate of 8.0%. IT IS ALSO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AN D DECREED that defendant have judgment against plaintiff in the sum of One Hundred Eighty-three Thousand, Three Hundred Forty-one and 65/100 Dollars ($183,341.65), plus postjudgment interest. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961, postjudgment inter est is payable on all of the above sum, from the date this judgment is entered until the date this judgment is paid, at the rate of.27%. IT IS SO ORDERED, this 2nd day of December, 2009. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 2, 2009. (dmc) Modified on 12/3/2009 to edit text (dmc).
December 15, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 15, 2008. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada v. Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC
Represented By: Joi Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Mountain Valley Spring Company, LLC
Represented By: Joi Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Southern Wine and Spirits of Nevada
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?