DataCom Systems, Inc. v. JDL Digital Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: DataCom Systems, Inc.
Defendant: JDL Digital Systems, Inc., Airship Industries, Inc., John Zhu, Song Xu, John Xu and Victor Huang
Case Number: 6:2008cv06102
Filed: November 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 21, 2009. (lw)
November 13, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is given (10) days from the date of this order to produce the responsive documents. As for the award of reasonable expenses pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 37(a) (5), this Court find Plaintiff's nondisclosure was substantially justified. Therefore, this Court declines to award Defendants reasonable expenses. Furthermore, 37 Motion to Stay is also granted. The Parties are given until (10) days after Plaintiff produces the documents responsive to this order to submit their expert reports. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 13, 2009. (lw)
February 6, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINNION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's complaint against Airship Industries, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. The remaining Defendants are hereby instructed to answer the complaint within ten (10) days. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 6, 2009. (dmc) Modified on 2/9/2009 to add text (dmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DataCom Systems, Inc. v. JDL Digital Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DataCom Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDL Digital Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airship Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zhu
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Song Xu
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Xu
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Huang
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?