Aydelotte v. Norris

Plaintiff: George Aydelotte
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 6:2008cv06113
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; adopting Report and Recommendations re 18 Report and Recommendations. Petitioner is advised that his petition should be re-filed in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi, Delta Division, Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 31, 2009. (dmc)
June 26, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by George Aydelotte, recommending Petition be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 26, 2009. (cap)
December 12, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer Petitioner's case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas, Hot Springs Division. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/12/08. (bkp)[Transferred from ared on 12/12/2008.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aydelotte v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Aydelotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?