Simmons v. Langley

Plaintiff: Marco Simmons
Defendant: James Langley
Case Number: 6:2009cv06054
Filed: July 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety re Report and Recommendations re 35 Report and Recommendations. Terminating motion 33 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to obey the orders of this Court. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 29, 2011. (dmc)
October 25, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER finding as moot 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 25, 2010. (tg)
October 7, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James Langley, recommending the motion be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 7, 2010. (cap)
July 10, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring this case t o the Western District of Arkansas and directing the Clerk to immediately transfer plaintiff's entire case file to that district. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/10/09. (bkp)[Transferred from ared on 7/13/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?