Arnett v. Turner et al

Plaintiff: Michael Arnett
Defendant: David Turner, Ray Wingfield and Rick Loyd
Case Number: 6:2009cv06068
Filed: July 30, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Clark
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 6 Adopting Report and Recommendations; Directing clerk to reopen the case for consideration of the plaintiff's MOTION 8 for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Arnett. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 8, 2010. (cnn)
February 3, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 5 Report and Recommendations, denying 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Arnett. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 3, 2010. (dmc)
January 13, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Arnett. Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 13, 2010. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnett v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?