Rynders v. Williams

Plaintiff: Buddy Rynders
Defendant: Larry - Williams
Case Number: 6:2009cv06088
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as set forth; ( Jury Trial set for 12/7/2011 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson.) re 39 USCA Mandate. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 9, 2011. (dmc)
September 21, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 15 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff's claims brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983, the ACRA, and the FMLA are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's claims brought pursuant to the Arkansas felony-tort statute (Count III) and for retaliatory transfer under the ACRA (Count IV) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's right to file them in state court. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 21, 2010. (cap)
November 13, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to stipulation and agreement. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 13, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rynders v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buddy Rynders
Represented By: Lucien Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry - Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?