Parks v. Wal-Mart et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Ray Parks
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Adam Castile, Micheal Buffington and Bill House
Case Number: 6:2009cv06100
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 8 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED forfailure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 7, 2009. (dmc)
November 17, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Anthony Ray Parks. Objections to R&R due by 12/7/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 17, 2009. (dmc)
October 20, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Arkansas, Hot Springs Division and directing the Clerk to immediately transfer plaintiff's entire case file to that district. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/20/09. (bkp)[Transferred from ared on 10/21/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Wal-Mart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ray Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Castile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Buffington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?