Miller v. Meyers

Plaintiff: Anna Miller
Defendant: Darin Meyers
Case Number: 6:2009cv06103
Filed: October 21, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims filed by Anna Miller; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Darin Meyers; granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Anna Miller, and the Counterclaim is dismissed with prejudice. Counterclaimant Darin Meyers and Counter Defendant Anna Miller terminated. (Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2 011 at 03:00 PM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Jury Trial set for 2/2/2011 at 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson.) Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 21, 2011. (cap)
January 4, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; denying as moot 15 Motion to Disqualify Counsel and granting 26 Motion to Withdraw Motion. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 4, 2011. (lw)
March 4, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For reasons herewith, Defendant's 3 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, Defendant's 3 Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement is GRANTED, and Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 4, 2010. (dmc) Modified on 3/5/2010 to edit text (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Miller
Represented By: Domingo J. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?