-BAB Clayton v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Larry Clayton
Defendant: Chris Williams, Richard Garrett, Gregory Crain, Cassandra Rowlund, Jagairan Cross, Rowe and Lingo
Case Number: 6:2010cv06073
Filed: September 29, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Larry Clayton; Denying 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Larry Clayton; finding as moot [6 ] Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Larry Clayton. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed on the grounds that the claims are frivolous, asserted against individuals who are immune from suit,fail to state claims on which relief can be granted or are not presently cognizable. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 6, 2010. (dmc)
November 8, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Larry Clayton. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 8, 2010. (dmc)
September 29, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to provisionally file 1 Complaint; and directing Clerk to send a copy of 2 Application to Proceed IFP to Larry Clayton. Plaintiff is given until October 15, 2010, to submit the certificate portion of the IFP application or pay the $350.00 filing fee. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 29, 2010. (jrs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: -BAB Clayton v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Rowlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jagairan Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?