Carter et al v. Affiliated Computer Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Martha Carter and Kimberly Ruff
Defendant: Affiliated Computer Services, Inc., Xerox Corporation and ACS@Xerox LLC
Case Number: 6:2010cv06074
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss, and Plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 11, 2014. (lw)
January 11, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Compel and a stay of these proceedings is hereby ORDERED pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 3. The parties shall advise the court within ten (10) days of any ruling in arbitration as to any remaining issues for this court.; ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 37 Report and Recommendations re 5 . Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 11, 2011. (dmc)
December 15, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by ACS@Xerox LLC, Xerox Corporation, Affiliated Computer Services, Inc.. Objections to R&R due by 1/1/2011. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 15, 2010. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Affiliated Computer Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Carter
Represented By: Luther O'Neal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ruff
Represented By: Luther O'Neal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated Computer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Victor Lawrence Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Victor Lawrence Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS@Xerox LLC
Represented By: Victor Lawrence Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?