Hamblin v. Steed et al

Plaintiff: Justin Hamblin
Defendant: Steed and Garland County
Case Number: 6:2011cv06026
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 25, 2013. (tg)
March 4, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 4, 2013. (tg)
April 11, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring this case immediately to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas, Hot Springs Division. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/11/11. (kpr) [Transferred from ared on 4/12/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamblin v. Steed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Hamblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?