Barbee v. Murphy et al

Plaintiff: Sylvester O Barbee
Defendant: Lisbeth Anne Murphy, Wendy Kelley and Marie Lane
Case Number: 6:2014cv06082
Filed: June 30, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; further granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. All remaining claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 23, 2016. (hnc)
September 16, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 16, 2015. (lw)
August 21, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Compel, see Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 21, 2015. (hnc)
June 30, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer this entire case file to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/30/2014. (jak) [Transferred from ared on 6/30/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbee v. Murphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester O Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisbeth Anne Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?