Amadu v. Simpson et al

Plaintiff: Shaibu Amadu
Defendant: Marietta Transfer Company Inc., G & D Leasing, LLC and Kenneth Simpson
Case Number: 6:2018cv06074
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER denying #10 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice to its refiling. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 28, 2018. (hnc)
September 27, 2018 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 27, 2018. (jas)
September 25, 2018 10 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Shaibu Amadu. (Neal, Jay)
September 25, 2018 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shaibu Amadu. (Neal, Jay)
September 6, 2018 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, Arkansas, case number 26CV-18-1129, filed by Kenneth Simpson, G & D Leasing, LLC, Marietta Transfer Company Inc.(lw)
August 27, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING the Defendants supplement their jurisdictional allegations by filing a response to this Order or an amended Notice of Removal by 9/10/18. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 27, 2018. (hnc)
August 27, 2018 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/3/2018. Jury Trial set for 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 27, 2018. (jas)
August 27, 2018 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1768427.. (Drennon, Baxter)
August 27, 2018 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to Parties. (hnc)
August 27, 2018 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Marietta Transfer Company Inc., Kenneth Simpson. Originally filed in Garland County Circuit Court on 8/24/18. (hnc) Modified on 8/27/2018 to add original filing date (hnc).
August 27, 2018 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against G & D Leasing, LLC, Marietta Transfer Company Inc., Kenneth Simpson, filed by Shaibu Amadu. Originally filed on 7/20/18 in Garland County Circuit Court.(hnc)
August 27, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Marietta Transfer Company Inc., Kenneth Simpson. (hnc)
August 27, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/29/2018 (hnc)
August 27, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, case number 26cv-18-1129., filed by Kenneth Simpson, Marietta Transfer Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amadu v. Simpson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marietta Transfer Company Inc.
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & D Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Simpson
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaibu Amadu
Represented By: Jay T. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?