Stompingbear v. Reed
Plaintiff: Happy Stompingbear
Defendant: Dexter Payne, Marshall Reed, Wendy Kelley, Sergeant Jesse Jackson, Sergeant Samuel Knight, Keith Waddle, John and Jane Doe Classification Committee Members, Major Rickens, Mr. Hulk, Tony McHan, Warden Gibson, Randall Watson, Mr. Teas, Mr. Jackson, Justine Minor, Joshua Mayfield, Mrs. Faust, Lieutenant Clark, Terrie Banister, Raymond Naylor, Sergeant Brian Cocknell, John and Jane Doe Defendants, Mr. Henig, Sergeant Steven Mitchell, James Lowe, Grant Harris, Steven Williams, Sharon Cantrell, Unknown Liability Insurance Company, Pearlie Johnson, Mrs. Robinson, John and Jane Doe Policy Makers, Jada Lawrence, John and Jane Doe Publication Committee Members, Sergeant Warren Walker, David White, Marvin Evans, Mr. Garry Jenkins, Governor Asa Hutchinson, John Doe, 1, Pritchard, Mr. Clark, Doe, Mr. Anderson, John Doe, 2 and Chaplains Doe
Case Number: 6:2018cv06105
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered the need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual and legal complexity of the case, and whether Plaintiff has the ability to investigate and present this case. In considering these factors, the Court finds that the claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and Plaintiff is adequately prosecuting this case at this time. The Court finds Plaintiff is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel. At a later stage in the case, Plaintiff may again request appointment of counsel if Plaintiff believes the circumstances justify such an appointment. As Plaintiff requested the appointment of John Wesley Hall, the Court contacted this attorney and confirmed that there was no existing attorney-client relationship between Hall and Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 18, 2018. (klk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Happy Stompingbear. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(hnc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Happy Stompingbear. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(hnc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 **DISREGARD PER CHAMBERS, ENTERED IN ERROR** TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 12/6/2018. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 15, 2018. (klk) Modified on 11/15/2018 TO DISREGARD PER CHAMBERS (hnc).
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 **DISREGARD, FILED IN WRONG CASE** Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (hnc) Modified on 11/15/2018 (hnc).
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as MOOT. Plaintiff has already been granted IFP status in this case. (42:1983).. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 13, 2018. (klk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Happy Stompingbear. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(lw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants, filed by Happy Stompingbear. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Court)(lw)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER terminating 11 Order Regarding Complaint Deficiency and striking #10 Amended Complaint filed by Happy Stompingbear as set forth. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 9, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #9 Motion for a Court Order directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to preserve all evidence related to Plaintiff's Complaint as premature. Defendants have not yet been served in the case and are therefore not subject to the Court's jurisdiction.. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 29, 2018. (klk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 ***TERMINATED, AS DIRECTED IN #13 ORDER***TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the First Amended Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed for the second time to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a Second Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A Second Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the Second Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Second Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Second Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 29, 2018. (klk) Modified on 11/9/2018 to add text(lw).
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN, AS DIRECTING IN #13 ORDER*** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marshall Reed, Pritchard, John Does 1-4 filed by Happy Stompingbear.(lw) Modified on 11/9/2018 to add text(lw).
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Order by Happy Stompingbear. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC - Ouachita River Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $17.17; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (hnc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, the clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the plaintiff.. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 29, 2018. (klk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Happy Stompingbear. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(lw)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 11/15/2018. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 25, 2018. (klk)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: An Updated IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 24, 2018. (mjm)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Happy Stompingbear. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mjm)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Terrie Banister, Sharon Cantrell, Clark, Brian Cocknell, John and Jane Doe Classification Committee Members, John and Jane Doe Defendants(Varner Unit), John and Jane Doe Defendants(Tucker Unit), John and Jane Doe Policy Makers, John and Jane Doe Publication Committee Members, Marvin Evans, Faust, Gibson, Grant Harris, Henig, Hulk, Asa Hutchinson, Jackson, Jesse Jackson, Garry Jenkins, Pearlie Johnson, Wendy Kelley, Samuel Knight, Jada Lawrence, James Lowe, Joshua Mayfield, Tony McHan, Justine Minor, Steven Mitchell, Raymond Naylor, Dexter Payne, Marshall Reed, Rickens, Robinson, Teas, Unknown Liability Insurance Company, Keith Waddle, Warren Walker, Randall Watson, David White, Steven Williams, filed by Happy Stompingbear.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stompingbear v. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jesse Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Samuel Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Classification Committee Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Rickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Hulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony McHan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Teas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrie Banister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Brian Cocknell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Henig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Steven Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearlie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Policy Makers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jada Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Publication Committee Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Warren Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Garry Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Asa Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplains Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Happy Stompingbear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?