Luman et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Co., Mary McDonald, Sandra Luman, Ronnie McDonald, Shelby Luman, Bryon Keith, Tina Haney and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv06113
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gary G. Hebert is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter if he has not already done so. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 2, 2019. (jsd)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Gary Hebert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1841784) by FCA US LLC. (Bingham, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted by 1/21/2019. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/15/2019. Jury Trial set for the week of 1/6/2020 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 7, 2018. (rwg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (Bingham, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC.(Bingham, Michael)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Bingham, Michael) Modified on 11/13/2018 (hnc).
November 12, 2018 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1816770.. (Bingham, Michael)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by Mary McDonald, Sandra Luman, Tina Haney, Ronnie McDonald, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Shelby Luman, Allstate Insurance Co., Bryon Keith. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Garland County on 10/10/2018 in case 26CV-18-1545)(mjm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
November 9, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to William D. Mahoney representing Plaintiff(s) in Removal Cases: The following attorney listed on the State Court Complaint is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: William D. Mahoney. An attorney can register for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to Local Rule 83.5 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures Manualfor Civil and Criminal Filings for further information. (mjm)
November 9, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (mjm)
November 9, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/13/2018 (mjm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by FCA US LLC. (mjm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, case number 26CV-18-1545., filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Pleadings)(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luman et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Co.
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McDonald
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Luman
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie McDonald
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Luman
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryon Keith
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Haney
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: William D. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael Stephen Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?