Wilmington O. Charles, Sr. v. Lexisnexis
Plaintiff: Wilmington O. Charles, Sr.
Defendant: Lexisnexis
Case Number: 6:2019cv06005
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 5, 2019. (mjm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lexisnexis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Reynolds, Bourgon)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lexisnexis. (Reynolds, Bourgon)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, filed by Lexisnexis. Wilmington O. Charles, Sr. served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Reynolds, Bourgon)
January 14, 2019 Set Answer Deadline: Lexisnexis answer due 2/6/2019. (lw)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to file a Response to #5 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint ; Defendant has up to and including 2/6/19 to file a responsive pleading in this case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 14, 2019. (hnc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Lexisnexis. (Reynolds, Bourgon)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bourgon B. Reynolds on behalf of Lexisnexis. (Reynolds, Bourgon)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Lexisnexis, filed by Wilmington O. Charles, Sr.(tg)
January 9, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexisnexis. (Reynolds, Bourgon)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg) (tg).
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lexisnexis. (tg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Garland County District Court, case number HTCV-19-17. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 5006921), filed by Lexisnexis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington O. Charles, Sr. v. Lexisnexis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexisnexis
Represented By: Bourgon B. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington O. Charles, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?