Smith v. Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Virginia D. Smith
Defendant: Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC, Navient Solutions, LLC and John Does, 1-25
Case Number: 6:2019cv06008
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virginia D. Smith. Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Saks, Yaakov)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Virginia D. Smith. Navient Solutions, LLC was sent waiver on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Saks, Yaakov)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC, Navient Solutions, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Honorable Susan O. Hickey no longer assigned to the case. (rwg)
January 18, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1852647.. (Saks, Yaakov)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(hnc)
January 18, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/22/2019 (hnc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Virginia D. Smith. (hnc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC, John Does, 1-25, Navient Solutions, LLC, filed by Virginia D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Recovery Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia D. Smith
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?