Willis v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Danny Willis
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv06060
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail, filed by Danny Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Grace, Connie)
June 4, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1925406.. (Carson, Staci)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (mjm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(mjm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Danny Willis. (Originally filed in Circuit Court of Garland County, Arkansas on 04/29/2019 in case 26CV-19-517)(mjm)
June 3, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/5/2019. (mjm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, Arkansas, case number 26CV-19-517., filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Summons for State Form)(mjm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Staci Dumas Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Willis
Represented By: M. Justin Minton
Represented By: Connie L Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?