Halcomb v. Mike McCormick
Petitioner: Kirk David Halcomb
Respondent: State of Arkansas 18th Judicial Circuit East and Sheriff Mike McCormick
Case Number: 6:2019cv06071
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in Service by Clerk - Certified Mail. Angela Gilham received documents on 7/17/19. (lw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in Service by Clerk - Certified Mail. Bertha Freeman received documents on 7/17/19. (lw)
July 15, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as to Mike McCormick using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 6087. Michelle C. Lawerence also served by Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 6094 as directed in #6 Order. (hnc)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 and #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Further, DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Mike McCormick (Mike McCormick is substituted as the proper Respondent in this case), Respondent is Ordered to answer or otherwise respond to the petition on or before 8/14/19. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 15, 2019. (hnc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kirk David Halcomb. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant. (mll)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING that a/an Completed IFP be filed. Completed IFP due by 7/26/2019. Further directing Petition to be filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 6/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 26, 2019. (lw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kirk David Halcomb. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(lw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kirk David Halcomb. filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 6/19/2019 as Ordered in #3 Order. (lw) Modified on 6/26/2019 to add text (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halcomb v. Mike McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Arkansas 18th Judicial Circuit East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Mike McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kirk David Halcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?