Shoulders v. Callison et al

Case Number: 6:2019cv06075
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Hot Springs Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (hnc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roderick Shoulders. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(hnc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00421. Docket sheet received.
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/27/2019. (jbh) [Transferred from ared on 6/28/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL: The above-styled case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris for further proceedings and recommendation. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/19/2019. (jbh) [Transferred from ared on 6/28/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Roderick Shoulders.(kdr) [Transferred from ared on 6/28/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roderick Shoulders. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 6/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoulders v. Callison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?