Brown v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Juanita Lynn Brown
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2019cv06080
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juanita Lynn Brown. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Long, Martin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Juanita Lynn Brown. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Long, Martin)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 1, 2019. (mjm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to SSA, Office of the General Counsel for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice (Other), #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #2 Complaint. (Long, Martin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to United States Attorney General for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice (Other), #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #2 Complaint. (Long, Martin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to United States Attorney for the Western District of Arkansas for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice (Other), #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #2 Complaint. (Long, Martin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Juanita Lynn Brown Certificate of Interested Persons (Long, Martin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juanita Lynn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IFP Application)(Long, Martin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Juanita Lynn Brown.(Long, Martin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Juanita Lynn Brown. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Lynn Brown
Represented By: Martin Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?