Swanson v. Medicredit, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Swanson
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Medicredit, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06082
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Jessica Swanson without Prejudice. (Lemberg, Sergei)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant Medicredit, Inc.'s answer shall be due on or before 8/23/2019. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 12, 2019. (mcc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jessica Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Lemberg, Sergei)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Swanson. Medicredit, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Medicredit, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Medicredit, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lemberg, Sergei)
July 11, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Civil Cover Sheet : $ 400, receipt number BARWDC-1944272.. (Lemberg, Sergei)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
July 8, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/10/2019. (mjm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Medicredit, Inc., filed by Jessica Swanson.(mjm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jessica Swanson. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. Medicredit, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicredit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Swanson
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?