Williamson v. Stieve et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Montana Williamson
Defendant: Dr. Jeffrey Stieve, Nurse John Doe and Dr. Jeffery Stieve
Case Number: 6:2019cv06085
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto. Plaintiff's Complaint should be and hereby is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. As dismissal of this action constitutes a strike under 18 U.S.C. 1915(g), the Clerk is directed to place a 1915(g) strike flag on the case. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 10, 2019. (lw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Carlos Montana Williamson. Objections to R&R due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 7, 2019. (hnc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC Varner Supermax Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $1.33; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (hnc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 16, 2019. (hnc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Carlos Montana Williamson. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(hnc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against John Doe, Jeffery Stieve, filed by Carlos Montana Williamson.(hnc) Modified on 7/17/2019 to edit text (hnc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Stieve et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jeffrey Stieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jeffery Stieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Montana Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?