Johnston v. Monterey Collections SVC
Plaintiff: Kyle Steven Johnston
Defendant: Monterey Collections SVC
Case Number: 6:2019cv06090
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/24/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 10, 2019. (lw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monterey Collections SVC. (Little, Brendan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Monterey Collections SVC.(Little, Brendan)
July 30, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1954821.. (Little, Brendan)
July 30, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (hnc)
July 30, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/1/2019 (hnc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Monterey Collections SVC, filed by Kyle Steven Johnston. Originally filed in the District Court of Hot Springs, Garland County, Arkansas on 7/2/19.(hnc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Monterey Collections SVC. (hnc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Hot Springs, Garland County, Arkansas, case number HTSC-19-98, filed by Monterey Collections SVC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Civil Cover Sheet)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Monterey Collections SVC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Collections SVC
Represented By: Brendan H. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Steven Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?