Travis et al v. Asustek Computer Inc et al
Plaintiff: Stacia Travis and Justin Camp
Defendant: Asustek Computer Inc, Asus Computer International, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. LTD., Simplo Technology Co. LTD, Best Buy Stores, L.P., Simplo Technology USA Logistic Company, LTD. and Samsung SDI America, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv06118
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Stacia Travis. Motion to Strike #20 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Sean F. Rommel. (mjm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay re #13 Initial Scheduling Order, by Asus Computer International, Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Koehler, Jessica)
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Wyly on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wyly, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #9 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint), #10 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint), #12 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) by Justin Camp, Stacia Travis. (Poynter, Scott)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 ***DISREGARD, Attorney Rommel to refile using his filing account*** NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Wyly on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wyly, James) Modified on 12/6/2019 to add text to disregard (mjm).
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 ***DISREGARD, Incorrect Attorney name on pleading, refiled see document #21 *** NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Wyly on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wyly, James) Modified on 12/6/2019 to enter text to disregard (mjm).
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Samsung SDI America, Inc.(Rupe, Alan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Ray Wilson on behalf of Asus Computer International, Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Wilson, Kyle)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. Marts, Jr on behalf of Asus Computer International, Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Marts, Gary)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica P. Koehler on behalf of Asus Computer International, Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Koehler, Jessica)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 12/11/2019. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 12/18/2019. Jury Trial set for the week of 2/1/2021 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 13, 2019. (rwg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Asus Computer International, Inc..(Tucker, Carson)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Eggburn on behalf of Simplo Technology USA Logistic Company, LTD.. (Eggburn, Eric)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Simplo Technology USA Logistic Company, LTD..(Munson, Bruce)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Best Buy Stores, L.P..(Tucker, Carson)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Daniel Holland on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Holland, Philip)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Everett Clarke Tucker, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tucker, Everett)
October 11, 2019 Complaint fee received via pay.gov: $400.00, receipt number AARWDC-1997922. (hnc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer Inc, Best Buy Stores, L.P., Samsung SDI America, Inc, Samsung SDI Co. LTD., Simplo Technology Co. LTD, Simplo Technology USA Logistic Company, LTD. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/15/2019) (hnc).
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 **DISREGARD, this event was incorrectly used by filer to pay filing fee for #2 Complaint** COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1997922), filed by Stacia Travis.(Poynter, Scott) Modified on 10/11/2019 to add text (hnc).
October 11, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/15/2019 (hnc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to ASUSTek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International, Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Simplo Technology Co., Ltd., Simplo Technology USA Logistic Company, LTD., Samsung SDI Co. LTD., and Samsung SDI America, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Poynter, Scott)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Stacia Travis.(Poynter, Scott) .
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Justin Camp, Stacia Travis. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travis et al v. Asustek Computer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacia Travis
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Represented By: Philip Daniel Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Camp
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Represented By: Philip Daniel Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asustek Computer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asus Computer International, Inc.
Represented By: Carson Tucker
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Represented By: Jessica P. Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplo Technology Co. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Carson Tucker
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Represented By: Jessica P. Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplo Technology USA Logistic Company, LTD.
Represented By: Eric Eggburn
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America, Inc
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?