Rice v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Rice
Defendant: Converget Outsourcing, Inc., Transworld Systems, Inc. and Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06132
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc..(Goodnight, F.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Transworld Systems, Inc..(McPherson, Keith)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; separate Defendant Transworld Systems, Inc. answer due 1/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 15, 2020. (hnc)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Transworld Systems, Inc.. (McPherson, Keith)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Separate Defendant Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. answer due 1/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 15, 2020. (hnc) Modified on 1/15/2020 to edit text (hnc).
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Goodnight, F.) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct spelling (hnc).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Transworld Systems, Inc. answer due 1/16/2020.. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 23, 2019. (lw)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. answer due 1/14/2020.. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 23, 2019. (lw) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct spelling (hnc).
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Goodnight, F.) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct spelling(hnc).
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Jason Goodnight on behalf of Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Goodnight, F.) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct spelling (hnc).
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Transworld Systems, Inc.. (McPherson, Keith)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Bryan Rice. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McGaha, Corey) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct spelling (hnc).
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., Transworld Systems, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct spelling(hnc).
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Transworld Systems, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (McGaha, Corey)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (McGaha, Corey)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2025645), filed by Bryan Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McGaha, Corey)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Bryan Rice. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Rice
Represented By: Corey D. McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Converget Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Keith M. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Represented By: F. Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?