Counts v. McAddo et al
Plaintiff: Lee Oliver Counts, Jr.
Defendant: Officer Woodall and Officer McAddo
Case Number: 6:2020cv06021
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) by Lee Oliver Counts, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 IFP Application)(mjm)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Lee Oliver Counts, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Request for Admission)(hnc)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Lee Oliver Counts, Jr.. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 25, 2020. (mjm)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Garland County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $1.33; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Garland County Detention Center). (hnc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ $350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 25, 2020. (lw)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Lee Oliver Counts, Jr. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(lw)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against McAddo, Woodall, filed by Lee Oliver Counts, Jr.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Counts v. McAddo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer McAddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Oliver Counts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?