National Park College v. Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: National Park College
Defendant: Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv06032
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Andrew Smith on behalf of Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.. (Smith, Joseph)
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Heyer on behalf of Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.. (Heyer, Eric)
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.. (Duke, Wm.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc..(Duke, Wm.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joseph N. Smith is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 6, 2020. (mcc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eric N. Heyer is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 6, 2020. (mcc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Joseph A. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2134931) by Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.. (Duke, Wm.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Eric N. Heyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2134804) by Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.. (Duke, Wm.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall have through Wednesday, May 6, 2020 to answer or respond. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 4, 2020. (mcc)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Affidavit of Service, #8 Notice (Other) by Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.. (Duke, Wm.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Wm. David Duke on behalf of Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.. (Duke, Wm.)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by National Park College of Consent to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer Complaint #2 (Ashley, Joshua)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by National Park College. Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc. served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Return Receipt)(Ashley, Joshua)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc. for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (Ashley, Joshua)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc. for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (Ashley, Joshua)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2104359), filed by National Park College.(Jones, Jamie)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by National Park College. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Park College v. Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit4 Education Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Smith
Represented By: Wm. David Duke
Represented By: Eric Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Park College
Represented By: Joshua C. Ashley
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?