Timber Automation, LLC v. FiberPro, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Timber Automation, LLC
Defendant: Henry Meyers, Jeremy Hutson, Joshua Krauss and FiberPro, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv06076
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Disqualify. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 9, 2020. (lw)
September 1, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by FiberPro, LLC, Joshua Krauss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Krauss Declaration, #2 Exhibit Raybon Declaration, #3 Exhibit Hollister Declaratoin, #4 Exhibit Dempsey Affidavit)(Provencher, Scott) Modified on 9/2/2020 to edit text (mjm).
September 1, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #33 Response to Motion, #21 Memorandum Brief in Support, #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Henry Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Applegate, Kayla)
September 1, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Henry Meyers. (Applegate, Kayla)
September 1, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jeremy Hutson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Jeremy Hutson)(Benham, Drew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 31 **DISREGARD, Attorney refiled with complete document, see #35 ** RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by FiberPro, LLC, Joshua Krauss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Krauss Declaration, #2 Exhibit Raybon Declaration, #3 Exhibit Hollister Declaration, #4 Exhibit Dempsey Affidavit)(Provencher, Scott) Modified on 9/2/2020 to disregard (mjm).
September 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Henry, III on behalf of Timber Automation, LLC. (Henry, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY by Jeremy Hutson re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case . (Benham, Drew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Separate Defendant Jeremy Hutson is directed to file the Reply forthwith. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 27, 2020. (asd)
August 26, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to by Jeremy Hutson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Brief)(Benham, Drew)
August 26, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Disqualify filed by Joshua Krauss. (Provencher, Scott)
August 26, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #24 Motion by Separate Defendant Joshua Krauss for Leave to File Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 26, 2020. (mcc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Joshua Krauss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief)(Provencher, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Timber Automation, LLC. (Kennedy, Kyle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #15 MOTION to Disqualify filed by Timber Automation, LLC. (Kennedy, Kyle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Timber Automation, LLC. (Kennedy, Kyle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Timber Automation, LLC. (Kennedy, Kyle)
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Jeremy Hutson. (Benham, Drew)
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Jeremy Hutson. (Benham, Drew)
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by FiberPro, LLC, Joshua Krauss.(Baker, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #15 MOTION to Disqualify by FiberPro, LLC, Joshua Krauss. (Baker, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Disqualify by FiberPro, LLC, Joshua Krauss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Provencher on behalf of FiberPro, LLC, Joshua Krauss. (Provencher, Scott)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Finch on behalf of Jeremy Hutson. (Finch, Matthew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Henry Meyers.(Applegate, Kayla)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Timber Automation, LLC. (Simpson, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. James on behalf of Henry Meyers. (James, Patrick)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla M Applegate on behalf of Henry Meyers. (Applegate, Kayla)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Courtney Bacon Benham on behalf of Jeremy Hutson. (Benham, Drew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service, filed by Timber Automation, LLC. Jeremy Hutson served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Kennedy, Kyle)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service, filed by Timber Automation, LLC. Henry Meyers served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Kennedy, Kyle)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service, filed by Timber Automation, LLC. Joshua Krauss served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Kennedy, Kyle)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service for FiberPro, LLC, filed by Timber Automation, LLC. FiberPro, LLC served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. (Kennedy, Kyle) Modified on 7/24/2020 to add service and answer due information (mjm).
July 22, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney listed on Complaint #3 is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Kyle D. Kennedy. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (mjm)
July 22, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2183730.. (Baker, John)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against FiberPro, LLC, Jeremy Hutson, Joshua Krauss, Henry Meyers, filed by Timber Automation, LLC. (Originally filed in Circuit Court of Garland County on 7/15/20 in case 26CV-20-824)(mjm)
July 22, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE in Removal Case re Service of Process directing Plaintiff Timber Automation, LLC to file affidavits of service (or copies of proof of service filed in state court) for defendant(s) who have already been served with summons and a copy of the complaint, and file proof of service in this court regarding defendant(s) to be served in the future. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 90 days after filing the complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) (mjm)
July 22, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (mjm)
July 22, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/24/2020. (mjm)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, Arkansas, case number 26CV-20-824., filed by Joshua Krauss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Pleadings)(mjm)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Joshua Krauss. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timber Automation, LLC v. FiberPro, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Meyers
Represented By: Patrick R. James
Represented By: Kayla M Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Hutson
Represented By: Matthew B. Finch
Represented By: Drew Courtney Bacon Benham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Krauss
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Scott D. Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FiberPro, LLC
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Scott D. Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timber Automation, LLC
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Kyle Kennedy
Represented By: Robert L Henry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?