Burchfield v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Bradley C. Burchfield
Defendant: Members of US Congress, John Doe Director of DEA, Judge Barry Bryant, Jack Ma, William Barr, Chief Steven Elrod, John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service, Jeff Bezos, Nurse Betty, Doe ADC Director, Donald Trump, Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director, Trent Daniels, Gina Haskell, Asa Hutchinson, John Doe Director of CDC, General Assembly of Arkansas Members, Dr. Absalom Tilloy, Lieutenant Stapleton, Joe Jones, Judge Robert T. Dawson, Members of US Senate, Tim Beckham, Judge Hernsberger, Michelle Lawrence, Sheriff Mike McCormick, Leslie Rutledge, Judge Ohms (Holmes), Richard Davis, Nurse Briggette Johnson, Judge Susan O. Hickey, Bryan Achorn, Judge Homer Wright, Members of the Arkansas Bar Association, Dexter Payne, James M. Murray, Timothy J. Shea, Leyuan Wang Lung, Robert Redfield, David Zhang and Jerry Bradshaw
Case Number: 6:2020cv06150
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender. Mail originally sent to Bradley Burchfield at PO Box 1644 Hot Springs, AR. 71902 including #14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Bradley C. Burchfield, #13 Notice of Change of Address, #15 Notice (Other) filed by Bradley C. Burchfield. No new address available. New Address due by 3/15/2021. (jlm)
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #14 Motion to Change Venue. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. 1391 venue is proper in this District. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 4, 2021. (klk)
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of filing form 8888 of 2015 by Bradley C. Burchfield. (lw)
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Change of Venue by Bradley C. Burchfield. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lw)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address for Bradley Burchfield. There are no documents to resend. (jlm)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. Plaintiff filed a Notice of Change of Address indicating the he has now been released from custody. When a Plaintiff is released from confinement, the policy of the Court is to require re-submission of affidavits to determine whether he should be required to pay all, or a portion of, the fees and costs of the lawsuit. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he is directed to pay the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee, or to resubmit an IFP application which reflects his free-world financial status within 21 days of the date of this Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: the Clerk is directed to send a blank IFP Application to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee or complete and sign the IFP Application within 21 days. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee or resubmit an IFP application by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 2/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on January 19, 2021. (klk)
January 6, 2021 Set Deadline: Completed Appeal IFP due by 1/27/2021. Blank IFP form provided to Plaintiff. (lw)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 5 Order, by Bradley C. Burchfield. ( via U.S. Postal Service: Bradley C. Burchfield ) (Attachments: #1 Letter from 8USCA dated 12/31/2020)(lw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bradley C. Burchfield.(lw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Garland County Sheriff to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $15.30; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Garland County Sheriff). (lw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on January 4, 2021. (klk)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Bradley C. Burchfield. There are no documents to resend. (lw)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Bradley C. Burchfield. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(mll)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER: With the exception of the IFP application and Amended Complaint that Plaintiff was ordered to submit, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to accept no further amendments, supplements, or motions from Plaintiff without prior approval from the Court. The Clerk is directed to return any filings tendered by Plaintiff to him until further order of this Court. Mr. Burchfield is also ADVISED that he may not submit filings for cases in which he is not the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on December 17, 2020. (klk)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff is also ADVISED that he may ONLY address injuries to himself.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on December 16, 2020. (klk)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 15, 2020. (mjm) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit deadline date (mjm).
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bryan Achorn, William Barr, Tim Beckham, Betty, Jeff Bezos, Barry Bryant, Trent Daniels, Richard Davis, Robert T. Dawson, Doe ADC Director, Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director, John Doe Director of CDC, John Doe Director of DEA, John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service, Steven Elrod, General Assembly of Arkansas Members, Gina Haskell, Hernsberger, Susan O. Hickey, Asa Hutchinson, Briggette Johnson, Joe Jones, Michelle Lawrence, Jack Ma, Mike McCormick, Members of US Congress, Members of US Senate, Members of the Arkansas Bar Association, Ohms (Holmes), Leslie Rutledge, Stapleton, Absalom Tilloy, Donald Trump, Homer Wright, filed by Bradley C. Burchfield. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed Pro Se)(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burchfield v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Members of US Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Director of DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Barry Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Steven Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Betty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe ADC Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Director of CDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Assembly of Arkansas Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Absalom Tilloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Robert T. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Members of US Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Hernsberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Mike McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ohms (Holmes)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Briggette Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Susan O. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Achorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Homer Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Members of the Arkansas Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leyuan Wang Lung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Redfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley C. Burchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?