Gurdon, Arkansas, City of v. Altice USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gurdon, Arkansas, City of and Honorable Sherry Kelley, ex rel.
Defendant: Altice USA, Inc. doing business as Suddenlink Communications
Case Number: 6:2021cv06033
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Altice USA, Inc.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 21, 2021. (jlm)
May 20, 2021 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Defendant must file its reply brief on or before May 27, 2021. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 20, 2021. (ljl)
May 5, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to file Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion To Compel Arbitration by Altice USA, Inc.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
May 3, 2021 Filing 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held on or before 5/31/2021. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 6/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2022 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 3, 2021. (rwg)
April 29, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gurdon, Arkansas, City of. (Crowder, William)
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kyle P. Seelbach appearing for Defendant. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 19, 2021. (ljl)
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Kyle P. Seelbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2371958) by Altice USA, Inc.. (Seelbach, Kyle)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Altice USA, Inc.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
April 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Altice USA, Inc.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Daniel Fitzgibbon, #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Ahmed Fayed)(Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Altice USA, Inc.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Altice USA, Inc.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Altice USA, Inc. answer due 4/15/2021. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 2, 2021. (jlm)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #7 MOTION to Remand by Gurdon, Arkansas, City of. (Crowder, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Gurdon, Arkansas, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1 - Declaration of Amy Woods)(Crowder, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomas Crowder on behalf of Gurdon, Arkansas, City of. (Crowder, William)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altice USA, Inc.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Altice USA, Inc., filed by Sherry Kelley, ex rel., Gurdon, Arkansas, City of. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Clark County on 02/21/2021 in case number 10CV-21-19)(mjm)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mjm)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clark County, case number 10CV-21-19, filed by Altice USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(mjm) Modified on 3/29/2021 to edit text (mjm).
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Altice USA, Inc.. (mjm)
March 29, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2359326.. (Ziegenhorn, Jennifer)
March 29, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/31/2021.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurdon, Arkansas, City of v. Altice USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurdon, Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Todd M. Turner
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honorable Sherry Kelley, ex rel.
Represented By: Todd M. Turner
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altice USA, Inc. doing business as Suddenlink Communications
Represented By: Jennifer Gay Ziegenhorn
Represented By: Floyd Thomas Curry
Represented By: Kyle Seelbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?