Callaway v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Clayton Callaway
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2021cv06045
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 ADDENDUM by Clayton Callaway to #7 Affidavit of Service as to USA Return Receipt - USAG.. (Coleman, Nicholas)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 ADDENDUM by Clayton Callaway to #7 Affidavit of Service as to USA Return Receipt OGC.. (Coleman, Nicholas)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Clayton Callaway. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/28/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Return Receipt - USDA)(Coleman, Nicholas)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Clayton Callaway. (Coleman, Nicholas)
April 22, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Susan O. Hickey and Honorable Barry A. Bryant, as the referral judge. (lw)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(jlm)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to U.S. Attorney - Western District of Arkansas; Office of Regional Chief Counsel; Attorney General of United States for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Coleman, Nicholas)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2373387), filed by Clayton Callaway.(Coleman, Nicholas)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Clayton Callaway. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callaway v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Callaway
Represented By: Nicholas Lynn Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?