Chambers v. Payne
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Petitioner: Gary Chambers
Case Number: 6:2021cv06129
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY by Gary Chambers re #8 Response to Petition. (mjm)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - One-Volume Trial Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Argument Portion of Appellant's Brief on Appeal, #3 Exhibit 3 - One-Volume Rule 37 Record, #4 Exhibit 4 - Briefing Notice, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice Dismissing Appeal, #6 Exhibit INDEX)(Rumpz, Pamela)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Leslie Rutledge received documents on 9/27/2021. (lw)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Anne Rumpz on behalf of Dexter Payne. (Rumpz, Pamela)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Muriel Mayfield received documents for Dexter Payne on 9/27/2021. (lw)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Clerk of Court is directed to serve Respondent. Response due 10/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 23, 2021. (jlm)
September 23, 2021 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Dexter Payne using Certified Mail Article number 70132630000168686445 and Leslie Rutledge using Certified Mail Article number 70132630000168686438. (jlm)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Chambers. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mjm)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gary Chambers.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?