Herndon v. Byers et al
Plaintiff: John Elwain Herndon
Defendant: Warden Byers, Amber Colson and John or Jane Does 1-4
Case Number: 6:2022cv06031
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Byers, Amber Colson and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #7 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Byers, Amber Colson and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 26, 2022. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(mjm)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC - OUACHITA RIVER UNIT to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $127.97; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (mjm)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 4, 2022. (klk)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by John Elwain Herndon. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mjm)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 4/12/2022. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 22, 2022. (jlm)
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Byers, Amber Colson, John or Jane Does 1-4, filed by John Elwain Herndon.(jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herndon v. Byers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Elwain Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Colson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?