Levac v. Haney et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Levac
Defendant: Jail Administrator Sarah Haney, Sheriff Travis Hill, Sheriff Garrett, Corrections Officer Stapleton, Correctional Officer Will, Correctional Officer Adrianna, John Does 1-29 and John Does 1-26
Case Number: 6:2024cv06047
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Hot Springs Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender - Refused No Longer Here. Mail originally sent to Daniel Levac at Pike County Jail including #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) and #12 Amended Complaint. No new address available. (tmc)
May 15, 2024 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. Mail originally sent to Daniel Levac at Pike County Jail including #16 Report and Recommendations. No new address available. (tmc)
May 10, 2024 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender - Refused. Mail originally sent to Daniel Levac at Pike County Jail including 14 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) and #15 Clerk's Order PLRA Fee. No new address available. New Address due by 6/10/2024. (tmc)
May 2, 2024 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Levac. Objections to R&R due by 5/20/2024. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on May 2, 2024. (jlm)
April 29, 2024 Filing 15 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Pike County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Pike County Jail). (tmc)
April 29, 2024 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #1 & #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 29, 2024.(ksb)
April 25, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Daniel Levac. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(tmc)
April 25, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #2 Complaint against Will, John Does 1-26, Travis Hill, Adrianna, Sarah Haney, Garrett, and Stapleton, filed by Daniel Levac. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Daniel Levac.(tmc)
April 12, 2024 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender - Incorrect Address on docket sheet (corrected). Mail originally sent to Daniel Levac at PO Box 157 Murfreesboro, AR including #7 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #8 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, and 1983 Prisoner Litigation Guide. Resent to Pike County Detention Center, PO Box 177, Murfreesboro, AR. (tmc)
April 4, 2024 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 4, 2024. (klk)
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. With his complaint, Plaintiff submitted an in forma pauperis (IFP) application. However, he failed to have the certification regarding inmate funds held in his name fully completed for the IFP application. Additionally, several sections of the form were left blank. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank Prisoner IFP Application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either have the certificate portion of the IFP application completed by the appropriate detention center official and return the application to the Court for review and filing or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 55.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 405.00 dollars. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 405.00 dollar filing fee by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 4, 2024. (klk)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tmc)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00274. Docket sheet received.
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer the entire case file to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas immediately. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2024. (jak) [Transferred from ared on 4/3/2024.]
April 3, 2024 MOTION REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Levac. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A Bryant.(tmc)
April 3, 2024 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (tmc)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Daniel Levac. (csf) [Transferred from ared on 4/3/2024.]
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Daniel Levac. (ajj) [Transferred from ared on 4/3/2024.]
March 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by Daniel Levac. (csf) [Transferred from ared on 4/3/2024.]
March 25, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Daniel Levac. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 4/3/2024.]
March 25, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Levac. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 4/3/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levac v. Haney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Levac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Administrator Sarah Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Travis Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Adrianna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-29
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-26
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?