Horn v. Peterson et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Lemuel Horn
Defendant: Mrs. Peterson, Lieutenant Martin and Sergeant Anderson
Case Number: 6:2024cv06049
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 4, 2024. (tmc)
June 3, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Introduction of Documents by Dustin Lemuel Horn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt)(tmc)
June 3, 2024 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations by Dustin Lemuel Horn. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration)(tmc)
May 30, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Dustin Lemuel Horn. (tmc)
May 28, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Introduction of Documents by Dustin Lemuel Horn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Documents)(tmc)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 SECOND MOTION for Subpoenas by Dustin Lemuel Horn. (tmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2024: #1 Exhibit) (tmc).
May 21, 2024 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Dustin Lemuel Horn. Objections to R&R due by 6/7/2024. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 21, 2024. (tmc)
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Subpoenas by Dustin Lemuel Horn. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tmc)
May 6, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel by Dustin Lemuel Horn. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tmc)
May 3, 2024 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Mark E. Ford. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983); Plaintiff is DIRECTED to pay the $350 filing fee and $55 administrative fee, a total of $405 by May 14, 2024. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 24, 2024. (tmc)
April 24, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983). You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 If the proper fees are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office. Filing Fee due by 5/14/2024 (tmc)
April 10, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tmc)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to file the in forma pauperis (IFP) application and complaint submitted by the Plaintiff. A determination regarding his status as a pauper and service of process will be made at a later time. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 10, 2024. (tmc)
April 10, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Dustin Lemuel Horn. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(tmc)
April 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Anderson, Martin, and Peterson, filed by Dustin Lemuel Horn.(tmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Lemuel Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?