Kenneth G. Keel v. Arnold Schwarzenegger et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth G. Keel
Defendant: Justice For Homicde Victims, Inc., Pete Wilson, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Does I-XXX, Henry T. Nicholas, III and Todd Spitzer
Petitioner: Terry Philpott, Danny Bell, George Lincoln Coats, Michael L. Hughes, Stephen F. Snow, Curtis Hawkins, Irving Humphrey, Michael L Williams, Tandy T. Thomas, Steven Earl McCain, Albert Welch, Harold Pashion Morgan, Victor M Correa, Lloyd Jenkins, Fredrick Dee Turner, James Messina, Leon H. Pogue, Gary Brian Meeks, Ronald Robins, James Howe, John V. Apollo, Edwin Carter, Warren C. James, Lamont McIntosh, Marlon Brown, Robert Shoulders, Reginald L. Bowdry, Ernest Marks, Delmos Whitley, Joseph B. Clark, Jeffrey Green, Jason C. Brown, Edward E. Mayfield, Bernal Morgan, Terry Ann Bryant, G. Mike Lane, Norman Williams, Ravon Good, Ramus E. Gwin, Marcus Blevins, Ray Anthony Butler, Jeremiah Sheppard, Allen Jenkins, Oscar Rodriguez, Glen W Robison, Michael Creddle, Timothy L Parler, Rufus Hodges, Shaun Douglas, Eric Simmons, Craig Stevenson, Kevin Wilson, Ronald Davenport, Jackie Rasberry, Jesse Jay cota, Wesley J Coleman, Dwayne A. Hampton, Terry Ramsey, Gary M. Kelly, Askia S Ashanti, Anthony L. Wallace, Craig A. Birch, Robert Brown, Taurus D'Antignac, James T. Elliott, Harry C Goodall, Jr, Ralph D. Thomas, David Maddox, Efren Escobedo, Juan Maldonado Fajardo, David E. Riemer, Johnnie Lee Pinkins, Dwaine Ray, Steve Joseph Noble, IV, Jose Gomez, Sidney Hubbard, Charles Edward De Loach, Demetrius Netter, Steven Mark Taylor, Lisa Coulter, Eric S Kemp, Robert John Bria, Keith Gatson, Eric E. Smith, Paul Taylor, Shawn Thurman, Paul S Millsap, Eric Deshawn Lon Don, Lorenzo Fosselman, George L Lugo, John Hill, Larry Ford, Booker T. Brown, Richard Kiper, Ronald Samson, Charles Silas, Ronald Jones, Shawn Louis Evans, William Jess Foust, Rodney Romero, Isidro H. Sigala, Schacobie H. Manning, Abelardo Soto, Keith Anderson, Duane Cotton, Randall S. Cash, Legrante V. Ellis, Arthur Holloway, Derrick D. Jett, Robert C. Evans, Sidney G. Stephens, Jr., Larry D. Wallace, Tracey M Waldron, George Payton, Grant Christopher Prouty, Russell Miller, Steven R Zimmer, Kirk D Murphy, Alonzo T Oliver, Larnell Crosby, Michael Barnette Mason, Milford Jay Peterson, Ryan Graham, Nick Betancure, Albert Fuller, Joe L. Samuel, Walter Wilkerson, James Blackwell, Ozello Johnson, Charles K. Rankin, Anthony R Williams, Larry Alexander, Anthony James Bell, Craig Wimberly, Brian K. Crawford, Raymond Scott, Douglas J. Manns, Wardean Ann Lee, Reginald Bradford, David Fresquez, Kevin Craig Stevens, Roberto Lopez, DELMAR FALLS, Edward C. Giles, Craig A. Ward, Jose G Marquez, Erik London, Ernest Turner, Frank Trudeau, Michael Maurice Ingram, Michael Singleton, Kevin Carr, William Thomas Coats, Rafael Sullivan, Milton L. Fields, Danny Dallas, Regina Merceron, Reginald L. Eldridge, Richard S Moore, Horace J Reeves, Calvin Laray Woods, Eric Andrews, Perry Calvin Washington, Carl Jones, Gabor Frank Magyari, Tanya S. Cooper, Francisco G. Guyton, Alejandro Martinez, Theodore Williams Emens, David S Simpson, Gregory Lee Gray, James Gordon, Josie Corella, Kevin L Holloway, Demetrius L. Howze, Kenneth Hernandez, Steven Pinkston, Robert C. Burlew, Christopher Prestfield, Eric Richard, Lawrence M Martin, Otis Green, III, R Martin, Raynell Carmichael, Robert Johnson, Alfred C Montoya, Santos L. Reyes, Lawrence Pamer, Anthony J Williams, Daniel Dent, Ervin Standifer, Bridgette Boycan, Henry Lee Hendrix, Charles Murphy, Edward Terrell, Bruce Charles Davis, David Calvin, Jr., Alan Lee Stark, Sherman H. Ellis, Kalain Hadley, Paul Fennell, Lawrence Gilliam, Charles Hogg, Benjamin Anderson, Charles K. Giannini, Carla Dale Harper, Tyrone W. Lymuel, Ricquel R Welch, Anita A. Alderete, Larry Williams, Maurice Hillard and Bernice Cubie
Case Number: 2:2008cv07591
Filed: November 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Victor B Kenton
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Filing 359 NOTICE of Change of address Filed by Movant Otis Green, III. (lmh)
September 1, 2010 Filing 357 JUDGMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, Related to: Order #356 . IT IS ADJUDGED that Judgment be entered dismissing the First Amended Complaint and entire action with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (rp)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER FOR SUMMARY DISMISSAL by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #354 , Amended Complaint #85 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this First Amended Complaint and entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (rp)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton, ORDERING Objection and Request to Appeal Memorandum and Order Denying Motions for Leave to Intervene submitted by Movant William Thomas Coats received on 08/30/2010 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Plaintiff filed a Stipulation to Dismiss Case on 08/19/2010. Filer terminated as of 08/03/2010 per docket #347. (rp)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order PREPARED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. Re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #3 , MOTION for Leave MOTION to Intervene #78 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(rh)
August 19, 2010 Filing 354 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case with prejudice filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel.(rh)
August 13, 2010 Filing 353 REQUEST to Intervene in Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #3 (rh)
August 13, 2010 Filing 352 NOTICE of Change of address Filed by Movant Otis Green, III. (rp)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from Milton L. Fields) Requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Milton L. Fields received on 08/05/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from Joe L. Samuel) submitted by Movant Joe L. Samuel received on 08/05/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
August 5, 2010 Filing 350 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Milton L. Fields. (rp)
August 5, 2010 Filing 348 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Joe L. Samuel. (rp)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: denying #263 Motion to Intervene; denying #272 Motion to Intervene; denying #276 Request for Order; denying #283 Motion to Intervene; denying #284 Motion to Intervene; denying #285 Motion to Intervene; denying #286 Motion to Intervene; denying #291 Motion to Intervene; denying #294 Motion to Intervene; denying #296 Motion to Intervene; denying #297 Motion to Intervene; denying #300 Motion to Intervene; denying #301 Motion to Intervene; denying #302 Motion to Intervene; denying #307 Motion to Intervene; denying #308 Motion to Intervene; denying #309 Motion to Intervene; denying #312 Motion to Intervene; denying #317 Motion to Intervene; denying #318 Motion to Intervene; denying #319 Motion to Intervene; denying #320 Motion to Intervene; denying #327 Motion to Intervene; denying #331 Motion to Intervene; denying #334 Motion to Intervene; denying #336 Motion to Intervene; denying #339 Motion to Intervene; denying #260 Motion to Intervene (rh)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: denying #282 Motion by Intervenors to correspond directly with Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rh)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order PREPARED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER PRESENTED by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. Re Request for Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R, Request for Relief #329 , MOTION to Intervene #319 , MOTION to Intervene #320 , MOTION to Intervene #327 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(rh)
July 27, 2010 Filing 345 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Randall S. Cash. (rp)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting #343 Request for Extension of Time to File Objection to the R&R up to and including August 20, 2010. NO MORE EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED ABSENT GOOD CAUSE. (rh)
July 19, 2010 Filing 343 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: Report and Recommendation (Issued) #315 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting #341 Request for Extension of Time to File Objection to re REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Objection #341 . Plaintiff's may have an extension of time up to and including July 12, 2010 to file his Objections to the Report and Recommendation. No more extensions of time will be granted absent good cause. (rh)
June 17, 2010 Filing 341 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Extension of Time to File Objection filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from James Messina) Requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant James Messina received on 05/28/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
June 2, 2010 Filing 338 NOTICE of Change of address changing address to Pleasant Valley State Prison. Filed by Movant Danny Dallas. (bem)
May 28, 2010 Filing 339 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant James Messina. (rp)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from Shawn Thurman) Requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Shawn Thurman received on 5/25/10 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (bem)
May 25, 2010 Filing 336 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Shawn Thurman. (bem)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from Lloyd Jenkins ) Requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Lloyd Jenkins received on 5/4/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (bem)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton, ORDERING Notice of Filing of Magistrate Judges Amended Report and Recommendation and the Lodging of Proposed Judgment and or Order submitted by Movant R Martin received on 05/10/2010 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Movant was terminated as of 10/07/2010 per Order for Judge Marshall denying the Motion to Intervene on 10/07/2009 (docket #220). Movant is not a party to this case.. (rp)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (fromm Terry Philpott) Requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Terry Philpott received on 05/14/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton, ORDERING Notice of Filing of Magistarte Judges Amended Report and Recommednation and the Lodging of Proposed Judgment and or Order submitted by Movant R Martin received on 05/10/2010 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Movant was terminated as of 10/07/2010 per Order from judge Marshall denying Motion to Intervene on 10/07/2009 (docket #220); Movant is not a party to the case.. (rp)
May 18, 2010 Filing 329 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued) #315 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter from Gary Brian Meeks requesting to intervene submitted by Movant Gary Brian Meeks received on 05/06/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
May 14, 2010 Filing 331 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Terry Philpott. (rp)
May 11, 2010 Filing 326 NOTICE of Change of address Filed by Movant Ervin Standifer, III. (rp)
May 6, 2010 Filing 327 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Gary Brian Meeks. (rp)
May 4, 2010 Filing 334 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Lloyd Jenkins. (bem)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from Ervin Standifer III) requesting to intervene and address change submitted by Movant Ervin Standifer, III received on 04/29/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from James Howe) requesting to intervene submitted by Movant James Howe received on 04/29/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (From Eric Simmons) requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Eric Simmons received on 04/29/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from Frank Trudeau) requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Frank Trudeau received on 04/16/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from Edwin Carter) requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Edwin Carter received on 04/20/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
April 29, 2010 Filing 318 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Eric Simmons. (rp)
April 29, 2010 Filing 317 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant James Howe. (rp)
April 29, 2010 Filing 316 Letter from Ervin Standifer III (rp)
April 22, 2010 Filing 315 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. Re (Prisoner Civil Rights), Amended Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #3 #82 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 PROP JUDGMENT) (rh)
April 22, 2010 Filing 314 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDEDREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton and Lodging of Proposed Judgment and Order. Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2010 (rh)
April 20, 2010 Filing 320 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Edwin Carter. (rp)
April 16, 2010 Filing 319 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Frank Trudeau. (rp)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter from Russell Miller submitted by Movant Russell Miller received on 04/06/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter from Edward Terrell submitted by Movant Edward Terrell received on 04/06/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
April 8, 2010 Filing 308 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant David Fresquez. (rp)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter Request to Intervene submitted by Movant Larnell Crosby received on 04/06/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
April 6, 2010 Filing 312 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Larnell Crosby. (rp)
April 6, 2010 Filing 309 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Russell Miller. (rp)
April 6, 2010 Filing 307 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Edward Terrell. (rp)
March 31, 2010 Filing 306 NOTICE of Change of address Filed by Movant G. Mike Lane. (rp)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Motion to Intervene submitted by Movant Ryan Graham received on 03/26/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Motion to Intervene submitted by Movant James Gordon received on 03/24/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Motion to Intervene submitted by Movant Christopher Prestfield received on 03/23/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 26, 2010 Filing 302 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Ryan Graham. (rp)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter from Victor M. Correa Requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Victor M Correa received on 03/22/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter from Taurus D'Antignac requesting to intervene submitted by Movant Taurus D'Antignac received on 03/22/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 24, 2010 Filing 301 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant James Gordon. (rp)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from Gregory Lee Gray) Requesting to Intervene submitted by Movant Gregory Lee Gray received on 03/22/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 23, 2010 Filing 300 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Christopher Prestfield. (rp)
March 22, 2010 Filing 297 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Taurus D'Antignac. (rp)
March 22, 2010 Filing 296 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Victor M Correa. (rp)
March 22, 2010 Filing 294 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Gregory Lee Gray. (rp)
March 22, 2010 Filing 293 NOTICE of Change of address Filed by Movant Legrante V. Ellis. (rp)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Motion to Intervene; Letter submitted by Movant Ramus E. Gwin received on 03/12/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 12, 2010 Filing 291 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Ramus E. Gwin. (rp)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter Requesting to Intervene from Milford Jay Peterson submitted by Movant Milford Jay Peterson received on 02/26/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter Requesting to Intervene from Ervin Standifer submitted by Movant Ervin Standifer, III received on 02/23/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter requesting to Interven from Shawn Louis Evans submitted by Movant Shawn Louis Evans received on 02/23/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter Requesting to Intervene from Michael Creddle submitted by Movant Michael Creddle received on 02/23/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
February 25, 2010 Filing 286 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Milford Jay Peterson. (rp)
February 24, 2010 Filing 282 MOTION BY INTERVENORS GEORGE LINCOLN COATS K92208 AND WILLIAM THOMAS COATS F97267 REQUESTING COURT NOTIFICATION TO CORRESPOND DIRECTLY WITH PETITIONER KENNETH G. KEEL filed by Movant George Lincoln Coats. (rp)
February 23, 2010 Filing 285 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Ervin Standifer, III. (rp)
February 23, 2010 Filing 284 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Shawn Louis Evans. (rp)
February 23, 2010 Filing 283 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Michael Creddle. (rp)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter (from larry Ford) submitted by Movant Larry Ford received on 02/04/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
February 4, 2010 Filing 280 Letter from Larry Ford (rp)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Request for Permission to File Motion to Intervene submitted by Movant Jose G. Marquez received on 01/21/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter submitted by Movant William Thomas Coats received on 01/20/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
January 21, 2010 Filing 276 REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO FILE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF JOSE G. MARQUEZ IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Movant Jose G. Marquez. (rp)
January 20, 2010 Filing 277 Letter from William T. Coats. (rp)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Letter submitted by Movant Michael L Williams received on 1/11/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (ag)
January 11, 2010 Filing 275 Letter from Movant Michael Lee Williams (ag)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING letter submitted by Movants William Thomas Coats, Larry Ford, George Lincoln Coats received on 1/5/2010 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (ag)
January 7, 2010 Filing 272 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movants William Thomas Coats, Larry Ford, George Lincoln Coats. (ag)
December 29, 2009 Filing 264 DECLARATION of Movant/Intervenor Marcus D. Blevins in Support of Motion for Reconsideration re: Memorandum and Order Denying Motions for Leave to Intervene filed by movant Marcus D. Blevins(ag)
December 28, 2009 Filing 267 Notice of Change of Address, filed by movant Derrick S. Jett (ag)
December 23, 2009 Filing 263 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE filed by movant Josie Corella. (ag)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: denying #209 Motion to Intervene; denying #210 Motion to Intervene; denying #215 Motion to Intervene; denying #216 Motion to Intervene; denying #217 Motion to Intervene; denying #218 Motion to Intervene; denying #219 Motion to Intervene; denying #250 Motion to Intervene. Movants/Intervenors Motions for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention are DENIED. (See Order for Details). (Attachments: #1 Report and Recommendation) (rp)
December 16, 2009 Filing 266 DECLARATION of Alfred C. Montoya in Support of Motion for Reconsideration re: Memorandum and Order Denying Motions for Leave to Intervene filed by Movant Alfred C Montoya. (ag)
December 16, 2009 Filing 265 DECLARATION of Jeremiah Sheppard in Support of Motion for Reconsideration re: Memorandum and Order Denying Motions for Leave to Intervene filed by Movant Jeremiah Sheppard. (ag)
December 15, 2009 Filing 259 REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION RE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE : EXHIBITS 1-40 re Order on Motion for Leave, #220 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
December 15, 2009 Filing 258 NOTICE of Change of Address changing address to Folsom State Prison. Filed by Movant Stephen McCain (rp)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Motion to Intervene submitted by Movant Harold P. Morgan received on 12/07/09 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
December 14, 2009 Filing 257 NOTICE of Change of Address changing address to P.O. Box 689, X-104L, Soledad, CA 93960. Filed by Movant Kalain Hadley (rp)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order PROPOSED ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. Re MOTION to Intervene #250 , MOTION to Intervene #218 , MOTION to Intervene #209 , MOTION to Intervene #217 , MOTION to Intervene #216 , MOTION to Intervene #210 , MOTION to Intervene #219 , MOTION to Intervene #215 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(rh)
December 9, 2009 Filing 256 NOTICE of Change of Address changing ADDRESS to CSP- Solano, P.O. Box 4000 / 6-130-L, vacaville, CA 95696. Filed by Movant Lawrence M. Martin (rp)
December 7, 2009 Filing 260 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Harold P. Morgan. (rp)
December 4, 2009 Filing 253 PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #85 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
December 4, 2009 Filing 252 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued) #212 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel.(rp)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting #248 Request for Extension of Time to File Responses to the court's memorandum and order denying motions for leave to intervene up to and including December 11, 2009. (rh)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Motion to Intervene submitted by Movant Harold P. Morgan received on 11/20/2009 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
December 1, 2009 Filing 250 MOTION TO INTERVENE - JOIN THIS CASE filed by Movant Harold P. Morgan. (rp)
December 1, 2009 Filing 248 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE RESPONSES TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF CIVIL DOCKET REPORT by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Objection to Report and Recommednation submitted by Movants Leon H. Pogue, Steven Earl McCain, Movants Anthony R Williams, Albert Fuller received on 11/04/2009 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
November 10, 2009 Filing 241 NOTICE of Change of Address changing address to Salinas Valley State Prison. Filed by Movant Michael Lee Williams (rp)
November 10, 2009 Filing 240 NOTICE of Change of Address changing address to Salinas Valley State Prison. Filed by Movant Craig Wimberly (rp)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting #239 Request for Extension of Time to File Objections to the Report and Recommendation up to and including December 1, 2009. (rh)
November 4, 2009 Filing 246 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued) #212 filed by Movants Leon H. Pogue, Steven Earl McCain, Anthony R Williams, Albert Fuller.(rp)
November 2, 2009 Filing 239 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (ag)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting #232 Request for Extension of Time to File Responses to the Court's Memorandum and Order Denying Motions for Leave to Intervene up to and including November 27, 2009. (rh)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: denying #222 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to ; denying #223 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to ; denying #224 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to ; denying Request for Enlargement of Time. The Court DENIES all of the above-referenced Requests for Extensions of Time as MOOT in light of the Memorandum and Order Denying Motions for Leave to Intervene issued on October 7, 2009. (rh)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: denying #230 Request for Extension of Time for Movant/Intervenor to File Objections as MOOT. (rh)
October 23, 2009 Filing 235 NOTICE of Change of Address. Filed by Movant Otis Green III aka Kamau A. Shabazz (rp)
October 23, 2009 Filing 234 NOTICE of Change of Address changing address to California State Priosn Solano. Filed by Movant Robert John Bria (rp)
October 22, 2009 Filing 233 NOTICE OF CORRECTION OF PRISON NUMBER filed by movant Charles Silas. (ag)
October 19, 2009 Filing 232 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE RESPONSES TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND COPY OF CIVIL DOCKET REPORT filed by plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (ag)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting #221 Request for Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R up to and including November 6, 2009. (rh)
October 9, 2009 Filing 230 REQUEST FOR AN ENLARGEMENT FO TIME OF 21 DAYS IN WHICH TO FILE HIS OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMEDNATION filed by Movant Leon H. Pogue. (rp)
October 9, 2009 Filing 221 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued) #212 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: denying #7 Motion for Leave; denying #8 Motion for Leave; denying #9 Motion for Leave; denying #10 Motion for Leave; denying #11 Motion for Leave. Denying docket numbers: 7-37; 45-50; 51-52; 55 & 59; 58; 61; 67-68; 69; 70; 71; 74-77; 73; 80; 88-203. For the foregoing reasons, Movants/Intervenors Motions for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention are DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rp)
October 1, 2009 Filing 224 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued) #212 filed by Movant Delmos Whitley. Lodged Proposed Order. (rp)
September 29, 2009 Filing 223 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued) #212 filed by Movant Otis Green, III. Lodged Proposed Order. (rp)
September 29, 2009 Filing 222 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued), Report and Recommendation (Issued) #212 filed by Movant Albert Welch. Lodged Proposed Order. (rp)
September 29, 2009 Filing 219 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Derrick D. Jett. (rp)
September 29, 2009 Filing 218 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Kalain Hadley. (rp)
September 28, 2009 Filing 217 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Delmos Whitley. (rp)
September 24, 2009 Filing 216 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Dwaine Ray. (rp)
September 22, 2009 Filing 215 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Lawrence Pamer. (rp)
September 17, 2009 Filing 212 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. Re MOTION to Intervene #155 , MOTION to Intervene #196 , MOTION to Intervene #102 , MOTION for Leave to intervene #7 , MOTION to Intervene #171 , MOTION to Intervene #152 , MOTION to Intervene #113 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #30 , MOTION to Intervene #199 , MOTION to Intervene #129 , MOTION to Intervene #192 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #13 , MOTION to Intervene #101 , MOTION to Intervene #108 , MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Leave #165 , MOTION to Intervene #123 , MOTION to Intervene #48 , MOTION to Intervene #111 , MOTION to Intervene #105 , MOTION to Intervene #189 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #28 , MOTION to Intervene #146 , MOTION to Intervene #117 , MOTION to Intervene #98 , MOTION to Intervene #160 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #11 , MOTION for Joinder in Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #3 #82 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #23 , MOTION to Intervene #174 , MOTION to Intervene #177 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #12 , MOTION to Intervene #150 , MOTION to Intervene #176 , MOTION to Intervene #49 , MOTION for Leave to intervene #8 , MOTION to Intervene #121 , MOTION to Intervene #120 , MOTION to Intervene #118 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #42 , MOTION to Intervene #149 , MOTION to Intervene #134 , MOTION to Intervene #69 , MOTION to Intervene #183 , MOTION to Intervene #161 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #34 , MOTION to Intervene #168 , MOTION to Intervene #136 , MOTION to Intervene #128 , MOTION to Intervene #68 , MOTION to Intervene #96 , MOTION to Intervene #47 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #26 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #10 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #37 , MOTION to Intervene #135 , MOTION to Intervene #154 , MOTION to Intervene #179 , MOTION to Intervene #106 , MOTION for Leave to Intervene #5 , MOTION to Intervene #175 , MOTION to Intervene #156 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #20 , MOTION to Intervene #130 , MOTION to Intervene #93 , MOTION to Intervene #140 , MOTION to Intervene #114 , MOTION to Intervene #158 , MOTION to Intervene #52 , MOTION to Intervene #137 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #40 , MOTION to Intervene #153 , MOTION to Intervene #127 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #24 , MOTION for Leave MOTION to Intervene #76 , MOTION to Intervene #139 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #15 , MOTION to Intervene #181 , MOTION to Intervene #112 , MOTION to Intervene #50 , MOTION to AMEND MOTION to Intervene #69 #71 , MOTION to Intervene #143 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #31 , MOTION to Intervene #193 , MOTION to Intervene #107 , MOTION to Intervene #104 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #43 , MOTION to Intervene #141 , MOTION to Intervene #178 , MOTION to Intervene #167 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #19 , MOTION to Intervene #170 , MOTION to Intervene #131 , MOTION to Intervene #191 , Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #3 , MOTION to Intervene #99 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #25 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #33 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #38 , MOTION to Intervene #88 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #32 , MOTION to Intervene #51 , MOTION to Intervene #173 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #22 , MOTION to Intervene #184 , MOTION to Intervene #91 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #17 , MOTION to Intervene #203 , MOTION to Intervene #92 , MOTION to Intervene #151 , MOTION to Intervene #55 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #29 , MOTION to Intervene #116 , MOTION to Intervene #95 , MOTION to Intervene #100 , MOTION to Intervene #169 , MOTION to Intervene #132 , MOTION to Intervene #164 , MOTION to Intervene #119 , MOTION to Intervene #159 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #27 , MOTION to Intervene #115 , MOTION to Intervene #46 , MOTION to Intervene #198 , MOTION to Intervene #142 , MOTION to Intervene #147 , MOTION to Intervene #97 , MOTION to Intervene #110 , MOTION to Intervene #188 , MOTION to Intervene #204 , MOTION to Intervene #163 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #16 , MOTION to Intervene #197 , MOTION to Intervene #202 , MOTION to Intervene #172 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #35 , MOTION to Intervene #145 , MOTION to Intervene #190 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE MOTION to Intervene #80 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #21 , MOTION to Intervene #58 , MOTION to Intervene #209 , MOTION to Intervene #138 , MOTION to Intervene #67 , MOTION to Intervene #187 , MOTION to Intervene #74 , MOTION to Intervene #45 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #36 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #14 , MOTION for Leave MOTION to Intervene #77 , MOTION to Intervene #89 , MOTION to Intervene #201 , MOTION to Intervene #144 , MOTION to Intervene #73 , MOTION to Intervene #148 , MOTION to Intervene #94 , MOTION to Intervene #126 , MOTION for Leave MOTION to Intervene #78 , MOTION to Intervene #157 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #41 , MOTION for Leave to intervene #9 , MOTION to Intervene #166 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #39 , MOTION to Intervene #185 , MOTION to Intervene #186 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE #18 , MOTION to Intervene #200 , MOTION to Intervene #124 , MOTION to Intervene #180 , MOTION to Intervene #59 , MOTION to Intervene #122 , MOTION to Intervene #133 , MOTION to Intervene #182 , MOTION to Intervene #109 , MOTION to Intervene #103 , MOTION to Intervene #210 , MOTION to Intervene #194 , MOTION to Intervene #125 , MOTION to Intervene #195 , MOTION to Intervene #162 , MOTION to Intervene #90 , MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE MOTION to Intervene #75 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 proposed judgment) (rh)
September 17, 2009 Filing 211 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton and Lodging of Proposed Judgment and Order. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2009 (rh)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: denying #86 Motion for Default Judgment ; denying #87 Motion for Default Judgment (rh)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: denying #84 Request for Reconsideration ; denying #84 Request for Appointment of Counsel (rh)
September 15, 2009 Filing 210 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Craig Wimberly. (rp)
September 15, 2009 Filing 209 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Albert Fuller. (rp)
August 28, 2009 Filing 204 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO INTERVENE AND ENJOIN PETITIONER AS PLAINTIFF IN CLASS ACTION filed by Movant Gary M. Kelly. (rp)
August 26, 2009 Filing 165 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by Movant Edward E. Mayfield. (rp)
August 20, 2009 Filing 87 MOTION REQUESTING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON THE DEFENDANTS WITHIN THIS ACTION, FOR THEIR FAILURE TO OPPOSE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO INTERVENE -JOIN- THIS CASE, i.e., TO CERTIFY A CLASS ACTION, WITHIN THE 30 DAY TIME REQUIREMENT filed by Movant Curtis Nelson. (rp)
August 20, 2009 Filing 86 MOTION REQUESTING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON THE DEFENDANTS WITHIN THIS ACTION, FOR THEIR FAILURE TO OPPOSE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO INTERVENE -JOIN- THIS CASE, i.e., TO CERTIFY A CLASS ACTION, WITHIN THE 30 DAY TIME REQUIREMENT filed by Movant Michael L. Hughes. (rp)
August 12, 2009 Filing 85 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #3 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
August 12, 2009 Filing 84 REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
August 11, 2009 Filing 203 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant John Hill. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 202 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Kenneth Hernandez. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 201 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Curtis Hawkins. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 200 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Carla Dale Harper. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 199 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Jeffrey Green. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 198 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Harry C. Goodall. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 197 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Jose Gomez. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 196 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Lawrence Gilliam. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 195 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Edward C. Giles. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 194 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Charles K. Giannini. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 193 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Keith Gatson. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 192 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant William Jess Foust. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 191 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Juan Maldonado Fajardo. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 190 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Robert C. Evans. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 189 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Efren Escobedo. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 188 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Theodore Williams Emens. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 187 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Legrante V. Ellis. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 186 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant James T. Elliott. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 185 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Reginald L. Eldridge. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 184 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Shaun Douglas. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 183 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Daniel Dent. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 182 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Charles Edward De Loach. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 181 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Bruce Charles Davis. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 180 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Danny Dallas. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 179 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Bernice Cubie. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 178 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Lisa Coulter. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 177 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Jesse Jay cota. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 176 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Raynell Carmichael. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 175 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Tanya S. Cooper. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 174 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Wesley J. Coleman. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 173 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Joseph B. Clark. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 172 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Kevin Carr. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 171 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant David Calvin, Jr. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 170 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Robert C. Burlew. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 169 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Terry Ann Bryant. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 168 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Robert John Bria. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 167 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Robert Brown. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 166 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Marlon Brown. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 164 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Reginald Bradford. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 163 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Bridgette Boycan. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 162 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Reginald L. Bowdry. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 161 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant James Blackwell. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 160 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Nick Betancure. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 159 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Anthony James Bell. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 158 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant John V. Apollo. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 157 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Eric Andrews. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 156 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Keith Anderson. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 155 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Benjamin Anderson. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 154 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Larry Alexander. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Steven R Zimmer. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 152 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Calvin Laray Woods. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 151 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Michael L Williams. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 150 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Anthony R Williams. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 149 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Walter Wilkerson. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 148 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Albert Welch. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 147 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Perry Calvin Washington. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 146 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Tracey M Waldron. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Ernest Turner. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 144 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Rafael Sullivan. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 143 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Kevin Craig Stevens. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 142 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Alan Lee Stark. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 141 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Abelardo Soto. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 140 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Michael Singleton. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 139 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant David S Simpson. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 138 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Charles Silas. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 137 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Robert Shoulders. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 136 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Kaman Shabazz. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 135 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Ronald Samson. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Rodney Romero. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 133 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Eric Richard. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 132 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Terry Ramsey. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 131 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Grant Christopher Prouty. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 130 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Steven Pinkston. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 129 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Johnnie Lee Pinkins. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 128 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant George Payton. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 127 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Timothy L Parler. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 126 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Alonzo T Oliver. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 125 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Steve Joseph Noble. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 124 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Kirk D Murphy(ag).
August 11, 2009 Filing 123 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Charles Murphy. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 122 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Bernal Morgan. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Richard S Moore. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 120 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Alfred C Montoya. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Paul S Millsap. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Regina Merceron. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 117 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Lamont McIntosh. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 116 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Michael Barnette Mason. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 115 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Alejandro Martinez. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 114 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant R Martin. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 113 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Lawrence M Martin. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 112 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Ernest Marks. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 111 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant David Maddox. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant George L Lugo. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 109 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Roberto Lopez. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 108 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Wardean Ann Lee. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Richard Kiper. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 106 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Eric S Kemp. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 105 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Ronald Jones. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 104 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Robert Johnson. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 103 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Allen Jenkins. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 102 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Michael Maurice Ingram. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Irving Humphrey. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 100 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant James Howe. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 99 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Kevin L Holloway. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 98 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Charles Hogg. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 97 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Rufus Hodges. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 96 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Maurice Hillard. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 95 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant George Michael Lane. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 94 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Larry Williams. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Ricquel R Welch. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 92 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Steven Mark Taylor. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Ronald Robins. (ag) (ag).
August 11, 2009 Filing 90 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Horace J Reeves. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Gabor Frank Magyari. (ag)
August 11, 2009 Filing 88 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by movant Eric Deshawn Lon Don. (ag)
August 6, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned District Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief District Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Case number will now read CV 08-07591 CBM(VBK). (rn)
August 3, 2009 Filing 82 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #3 filed by Movant Askia S. Ashanti. (rp)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton ORDERING Motion for Leave to Intervene, Declaration submitted by Movant G. Mike Lane received on 07/27/09 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (rp)
July 29, 2009 Filing 80 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE, DECLARATION filed by Movant G. Mike Lane. (rp)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton, ORDERING Civil Rights Complaint submitted by Movant Danny Bell received on 07/08/09 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Intervenor not permitted to file without Court permission.. (rp)
July 22, 2009 Filing 78 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE, DECLARATION filed by Movant Steven Earl McCain. (rp)
July 21, 2009 Filing 73 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION/REQUEST TO INTERVENE AS A JOINDER PARTY TO THE PENDING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION filed by Alexander McKenzie (ag)
July 21, 2009 Filing 72 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by movant Danny Bell. (ag)
July 16, 2009 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Intervene and Declaration filed by Movant Kevin Wilson. (rp)
July 16, 2009 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Intervene ; Declaration filed by Movant Francisco G. Guyton. (rp)
July 16, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to INTERVENE; Declaration filed by Movant Ravon Good. (rp)
July 16, 2009 Filing 74 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by Movant Duane Cotton. (rp)
July 14, 2009 Filing 71 FIRST AMENDED COPY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS MOTION TO INTERVENE AS JOINDER PARTY TO THE PENDING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION to amend Motion to Intervene #69 filed by Movant Anthony J Williams. (rp)
July 10, 2009 Filing 70 SECOND AMENDED MOTION TO INTERVENE AS JOINDER PARTY TO THE PENDING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION filed by Movant Leon H. Pogue. (esa)
June 29, 2009 Filing 69 MOTION to Intervene as a Joinder Party to the pending action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration filed by movant Anthony J Williams. (esa)
June 29, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE re current address filed by plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. Plaintiff's current address has not changed. (esa)
June 26, 2009 Filing 68 MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by Movant Michael L. Hughes. (rp)
June 25, 2009 Filing 67 MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by Movant Curtis Nelson. (rp)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint up to and including August 7, 2009. (rh)
June 23, 2009 Filing 62 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A 45 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (rp)
June 22, 2009 Filing 60 NOTICE AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #3 filed by intervenor Danny Bell. (esa)
June 19, 2009 Filing 61 PLAINTIFF ALDERETE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AS A JOINDER PARTY TO THE PENDING ACTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Movant Anita A. Alderete. (rp)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY COURT OF CURRENT ADDRESS by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. Within 15 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff will notify the Court of his current address, and, if applicable, telephone number. Plaintiff is advised that if he fails to apprise the Court of his current address, the Court will issue an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for want of prosecution. (esa)
June 10, 2009 Filing 59 FIRST AMENDED COPY PLAINTIFF POGUE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AS A JOINDER PARTY TOT HE PENDING ACTION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION filed by Movant Leon H. Pogue. (rp)
June 10, 2009 Filing 58 PLAINTIFF McCAIN'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AS A JOINDER PARTY TO THE PENDING ACTION. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY filed by Movant Steven Earl McCain. (rp)
June 4, 2009 Filing 55 PLAINTIFF POGUE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AS A JOINDER PARTY TO THE PENDING ACTION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION filed by Movant Leon H. Pogue. (rp)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: Denying #44 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiffs request for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (rp)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend; (2) the Court Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights form utilized by the Central District of California; and (3) Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this Order within which to file a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be complete within itself and shall not incorporate by reference any new portion of the original Complaint or Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may not add new parties without leave of the Court. Failure to comply with the requirements set forth in this Order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed with prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form) (rp)
May 12, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Jose Gomez. (esa)
May 12, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Oscar Rodriguez. (esa)
March 23, 2009 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE: DECLARATION OF SIDNEY G. STEPHENS JR. filed by Movant Sidney G. Stephens, Jr.. (rp)
March 23, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE: DECLARATION OF RAY A. BUTLER filed by Movant Ray A. Butler. (rp)
March 23, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE: DECLARATION OF GLEN W. ROBISON filed by Movant Glen W. Robison. (rp)
March 23, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE: DECLARATION OF OZELLO O. JOHNSON filed by Movant Ozello O. Johnson. (rp)
March 23, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE: DECLARATION OF DELMAR FALLS filed by Movant Delmar Falls. (rp)
March 23, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE: DECLARATION OF NORMAN WILLIAMS filed by Movant Norman Williams. (rp)
February 9, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Danny Bell. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Paul Taylor. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Tandy T. Thomas. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Ralph D. Thomas. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Anthony L. Wallace. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Fredrick Dee Turner. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Larry D. Wallace. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Craig Stevenson. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Lorenzo Fosselman. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Craig A. Ward. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Stephen F. Snow. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Eric E. Smith. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Isidro H. Sigala. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Jeremiah Sheppard. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant David E. Riemer. (esa) Modified on 2/24/2009 (esa).
February 9, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Santos L. Reyes. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Jackie Rasberry. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENEL; DECLARATI0N filed by movant Charles K. Rankin. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Demetrius Netter. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Douglas J. Manns. (esa) Modified on 2/24/2009 (esa).
February 9, 2009 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; AFFIDAVIT AND DECLARATION filed by movant Schacobie H. Manning. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Tyrone W. Lymuel. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Warren C. James. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Carl Jones. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Arthur Holloway. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Henry Lee Hendrix. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Sidney Hubbard. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Demetrius L. Howze. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Dwayne A. Hampton. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Paul Fennell, Jr. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Ronald Davenport. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Sherman H. Ellis. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Jason C. Brown. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Brian K. Crawford. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Marcus Blevins. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Booker T. Brown. (esa)
February 9, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION filed by movant Craig A. Birch. (esa)
December 8, 2008 Filing 6 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Request for judicial notice, #2 Part 2 to Request for judicial notice, #3 Part 3 to Request for judicial notice)(et)
December 8, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Intervene; declaration filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (et)
December 8, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to United States Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (et)
December 8, 2008 Filing 3 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Arnold Schwarzenegger, Henry T. Nicholas, III, Pete Wilson, Todd Spitzer, Justice For Homicde Victims, Inc., Does pursuant to 28:1331. Case assigned to Judge Robert M. Takasugi and referred to Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (Filing fee: IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED.), filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (et)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: GRANTING re REQUEST to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees, Declaration in Support #1 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, accordance with 28 USC Section 1915, the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the total filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $-0- must be paid within 30 days of the date of this is filed. Failure to remit the initial partial filing fee may be result in dismissal of your case. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with 28 USC Section 1915. (et)
November 18, 2008 Filing 1 APPLICIATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, filed by plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (Attachments: #1 Lodged face pages of Complaint)(ghap)
November 18, 2008 LODGED COMPLAINT forwarded to Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Keel. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth G. Keel v. Arnold Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terry Philpott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Lincoln Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael L. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen F. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Irving Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tandy T. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Earl McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Albert Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold Pashion Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor M Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lloyd Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fredrick Dee Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Messina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leon H. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Brian Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John V. Apollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren C. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamont McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marlon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Shoulders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reginald L. Bowdry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernest Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delmos Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph B. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward E. Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bernal Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terry Ann Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: G. Mike Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norman Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ravon Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramus E. Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ray Anthony Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremiah Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glen W Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Creddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy L Parler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rufus Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shaun Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jackie Rasberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Jay cota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wesley J Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dwayne A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terry Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Askia S Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony L. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig A. Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Taurus D'Antignac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harry C Goodall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ralph D. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Efren Escobedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Maldonado Fajardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David E. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnnie Lee Pinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dwaine Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve Joseph Noble, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sidney Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Edward De Loach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demetrius Netter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Mark Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric S Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert John Bria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Gatson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul S Millsap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Deshawn Lon Don
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lorenzo Fosselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George L Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Booker T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Kiper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Silas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn Louis Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Jess Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodney Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isidro H. Sigala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Schacobie H. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abelardo Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Duane Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall S. Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Legrante V. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick D. Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert C. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sidney G. Stephens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry D. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracey M Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Grant Christopher Prouty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven R Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kirk D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alonzo T Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larnell Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Barnette Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Milford Jay Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nick Betancure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Albert Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joe L. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ozello Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles K. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony R Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony James Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian K. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raymond Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas J. Manns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wardean Ann Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reginald Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Fresquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Craig Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roberto Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DELMAR FALLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig A. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose G Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erik London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernest Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Trudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Maurice Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Thomas Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rafael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Milton L. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Regina Merceron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reginald L. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard S Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Horace J Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Calvin Laray Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Perry Calvin Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabor Frank Magyari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanya S. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francisco G. Guyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alejandro Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Theodore Williams Emens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David S Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Josie Corella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin L Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demetrius L. Howze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Pinkston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert C. Burlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Prestfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Otis Green, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: R Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raynell Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfred C Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Santos L. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence Pamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ervin Standifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bridgette Boycan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Henry Lee Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce Charles Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Calvin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Lee Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sherman H. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kalain Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Benjamin Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles K. Giannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carla Dale Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrone W. Lymuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricquel R Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anita A. Alderete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice Hillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bernice Cubie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice For Homicde Victims, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-XXX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry T. Nicholas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth G. Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?