In Re Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor, S. P., Lisette Barajas, Anabel Samperio, Laura Guzman, Mariana De La Torre, Deodre Cotton, Erik Garcia, Ramona Garcia, E. A. G., Erika A. Garcia, E. G. G., Blanca Perez, Diana Flores, X. B., A. P., Luis Rojas, Miguel Bustamante, Veronica Ramos, Brayant Rivas, B. R., V. A., Milvia Nivety Torres, Kevin Torres, Mario Rene Torres, Susan Flores, Ricardo Lopez, Jorge Avila, Jonathan Avila, M. L., S. C. F., Aracely Monroy De Flores, Evelyn Vierna, Edwin Morales, Ethan Morales-Vierna, Yeny Benitez, Victor Benitez, A. B., G. B., Maria Gabriela Vasquez, Elena Vasquez, Juan Vasquez, Miriam Borquez, Hector Christian Beza-Lara, Alejandra Morales, Jacqueline M Thomas Pait, Anson Bevans, Daisy Castillo, Rose Amah, Donovan Avant, Jorge A. Flores, Samuel Jimenez, Roger Lee, Thomas L. Langston, Fabiola Mejia, A. R., Maria Rivera, Ruben Ayala, A. H., Karina Areli Rosas Felix, Karen Partida, Daniela Partida, Kevin Partida, Hector Partida, Laisha Partida, Ana Gutierrez, Ian Leonel Carmona, Andrea Carmona, Andy Josue Carmona, Roberto Cornejo, Marleny Cornejo, Javier Urbina, Staphny Sarahy Torres, Alvaro Feliz Torres, Olga Lidia Torres, Mauro Gabriel Torres, Jesse De La Torre, Miguel De La Torre, Blanca Rocio Martinez, Miguel Angel Morales Garcia, Michael Angelo Morales, John Joseph Morales Martinez, Harrison Jacob Morales Martinez, Joel Bustamante, Juan Bustamante, Crystal Bustamante, Jose Guadalupe Rodriguez, Cenovio Rodriguez, Rosalia Rodriguez, Raymundo Perez Hernandez, Ana Castillo, Angel Antonio Fernandez, Angel Fernandez, Desiree Fernandez, Stephanie Fernandez, Karen Camacho, Diana Gallegos, Brianna Gallegos, Sara Gonzalez Flores, Daniel Alberto Flores, Valerie Nicole Flores, Juan Alberto Flores, Noe Peniel Flores, C. S., J. F., M. F., E. F., V. F., A. F., Lizet Flores, Elizabeth Diaz, Emilia Herrera, Gerardo Herrera, Nadine Escobar, L. D., S. D., Marvin Eschevarria Vivas, C. V., Larronda Williams, Dan Aguilera, Jennifer Belman, Maria Belman, Arthur Covarrubias, Danny Duran, Ryan Garrison, Shirley Gonzalez, George Hartley, William Hynson, Y. J., Veronica Jaime, K. J., Lizet Leon, Michael Loera, Sean Mahoney, Daisy Medina, B. M., C. M., Miguel Mejia, Joann Morales, Hector Ovalle, Quinn Peoples, Yesenia Quintero, Ricardo Reyes, S. R., Deanna Taylor, A. T., B. T., Juvetino Torres, Maria Valencia, Diana Valle, Maria Vasquez, J. W., Rebecca Yancovich, A. W., N. W., A. M., A. C., S. C., A. D., M. E., G. G., V. G., K. M., J. P., A. Q., R. T., G. T., Pedro Aguilar, Maria Aguilera, Martin Aguilera, Pedro Aguilera, Ricardo Canto, Ana Rosa Castro, Juan Carlos Cervantes, Josefina Duarte, Gabriella Eulloqui, Esteban Figueroa, Maria Godinez, Sandra Eliza Gonzalez, Lilliana Gonzalez, Victor Manuel Guerra, Jose Hernandez, Peter Hernandez, Fabiola Inzunza, Azie L. Jones, Coretta Jones, Maria Lizarraga, Irma Lopez, Michael Melendez, Jose Luis Murillo, Martina Baeza Murray, Lisa Navarro-Gutierrez, Cenorina De Pedraza Aquino, Juan Pedraza Aquino, Camilo Pedraza Castillo, Jaqueline Pedraza, Luis Alvarado Perez, Maria Perez, Martha Quintero, Ramon Quintero, Edelmina Ramos, Estrella Ramos, Erik Melendez, Maria Rodriguez, Lubia Sanchez, Martin J. Sanchez, Adriana Serrano, Raul Serrano, Ana Rosa Tamayo, Deisy Tomas, Ingrid C. Villeda, Dontranail Warren, Rita Rosales, R. R., J. R., Maribel Ordorica, Philip Beal, Fernando Retana, Sofia Santos, Angela Solis, Salvador Zendejas Rodriguez, Maria Elena Zendejas, Salvador Alvarado, Gloria Veronica Alvarado, Ana Ornelas, Josefina Lopez, Christopher Sanchez Avila, A. V., C. P., E. O., E. S., G. R., I. L., I. S., L. P., M. B., P. R., Y. A., Rick Rodriguez, Jose Silva Plasecia, Jose Silva Plascencia, Suhydie Oliveros, Alfredo Bonilla Contreras, Juan Rodriguez, Guadalupe Pantoja, Isabel Pantoja Minjares, Yesenia Pantoja, Guadalupe Minjarez, Jazmin Minjares, Maria Alvarado, Jose Alvarado, Ma de Jesus Garibay Rivera, Zoila Tostados, J. T.,, L. W.,, Lonnie Lee, S. B.,, Ryan Ayala, Wendy Drake, M. B.,, Ebony Perry, Traci Williams, Silvia Castillo, A Minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Sash J. T. S.M., A Minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Sash L.S.C.M, A Minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Sash J. L. R.M., A Minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Sash J. J. M., Sasha Martin, Gerald Castaneda, Aeriel Marquez Marquez, Jade Marquez and BRANDON AMBROGI
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc., Doe 1 and Does 2 through 50, inclusive; From member case number: 2:22-cv-01589 JAK (SKx)
Petitioner: Rosa Santiago, Adrian B. Alvarez, Ivania Urrutia, Ixzel Alejandra Gonzalez, Arlet Fabiola Gonzalez, Matilde Ubias, Silvia Guardado, Angelica Melendez, Noemi Toral, Victor Sanchez Avila Sr. and Claudia Velarde
Consolidated Plaintiff: Y. C., Maria L. Rivera, Jose Frausto, Carlos Perez, Maria Erlinda Silva and Christina Flores
Case Number: 2:2020cv00786
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Autumn)
November 30, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Removal of Incorrectly Filed Document No. 50 // Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document: Document No. 50 filed by Plaintiffs Rose Amah, Donovan Avant, Jorge A. Flores, Samuel Jimenez, Thomas L. Langston, Roger Lee, Fabiola Mejia, A. R.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document: Document No. 50) (Barreto, Kimberly)
November 30, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs V. A., Rose Amah, Donovan Avant, Jonathan Avila, Jorge Avila, A. B., G. B., X. B., Lisette Barajas, Victor Benitez, Yeny Benitez, Anson Bevans, Hector Christian Beza-Lara, Miriam Borquez, Miguel Bustamante, Daisy Castillo, Deodre Cotton, Aracely Monroy De Flores, Mariana De La Torre, S. C. F., Diana Flores, Jorge A. Flores, Susan Flores, E. G. G., E. A. G., Erik Garcia, Erika A. Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Laura Guzman, Samuel Jimenez, Thomas L. Langston, Roger Lee, Frankie Lomas, Ricardo Lopez, Fabiola Mejia, Alejandra Morales, Edwin Morales, Ethan Morales-Vierna, A. P., S. P., Blanca Perez, A. R., B. R., Veronica Ramos, Brayant Rivas, Luis Rojas, Anabel Samperio, Jacqueline M Thomas Pait, Kevin Torres, Mario Rene Torres, Milvia Nivety Torres, Elena Vasquez, Juan Vasquez, Maria Gabriela Vasquez, Evelyn Vierna, Roxanda Yancor. correcting Notice (Other),,, #50 (Barreto, Kimberly)
November 25, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF ADOPTION / AMENDMENT OF MASTER COMPLAINT (INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS) filed by Plaintiffs V. A., Rose Amah, Donovan Avant, Jonathan Avila, Jorge Avila, A. B., G. B., X. B., Lisette Barajas, Victor Benitez, Yeny Benitez, Anson Bevans, Hector Christian Beza-Lara, Miriam Borquez, Miguel Bustamante, Daisy Castillo, Deodre Cotton, Aracely Monroy De Flores, Mariana De La Torre, S. C. F., Diana Flores, Jorge A. Flores, Susan Flores, E. G. G., E. A. G., Erik Garcia, Erika A. Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Laura Guzman, Samuel Jimenez, Thomas L. Langston, Roger Lee, Frankie Lomas, Ricardo Lopez, Fabiola Mejia, Alejandra Morales, Edwin Morales, Ethan Morales-Vierna, A. P., S. P., Blanca Perez, A. R., B. R., Veronica Ramos, Brayant Rivas, Luis Rojas, Anabel Samperio, Jacqueline M Thomas Pait, Kevin Torres, Mario Rene Torres, Milvia Nivety Torres, Elena Vasquez, Juan Vasquez, Maria Gabriela Vasquez, Evelyn Vierna, Roxanda Yancor. (Barreto, Kimberly)
November 16, 2020 Filing 49 Second STIPULATION for Order Case Management Order #2 filed by plaintiff Deodre Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2020 Filing 48 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT of Personal Injury Plaintiffs (ONLY) related to: #37 Amended Complaint/Petition, filed by plaintiff Deodre Cotton(Lamb, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 47 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for LIMITING DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S COMMUNICATIONS WITH CLASS MEMBERS #45 filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Lewis, Autumn)
November 6, 2020 Filing 46 OPPOSITION DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for LIMITING DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S COMMUNICATIONS WITH CLASS MEMBERS #45 filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Lewis, Autumn)
November 5, 2020 Filing 45 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for LIMITING DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S COMMUNICATIONS WITH CLASS MEMBERS filed by Plaintiff Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Filippo Marchino, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Marchino, Filippo)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 (IN CHAMBERS) AMENDED ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON SCHEDULING CONFERENCE(DKT. 41 )] by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of the current limitations in place during the COVID-19 pandemic, counsel are advised that the hearing set for Monday, November 9, 2020 will proceed by telephone only. No in-person appearances will be allowed. On the Court's own motion, the TIME for the Scheduling Conference is changed from 11:00 a.m. to 10:15 a.m. The Deputy Clerk will email telephonic instructions to counsel of record on or before Friday, November 6, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON SCHEDULING CONFERENCE(DKT. 41 )] by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of the current limitations in place during the COVID-19 pandemic, counsel are advised that the hearing set for Monday, November 9, 2020 will proceed by telephone only. No in-person appearances will be allowed. On the Court's own motion, the TIME for the Scheduling Conference set for October 5, 2020 is changed from 11:00 a.m. to 10:15 a.m. The Deputy Clerk will email telephonic instructions to counsel of record on or before Friday, November 6, 2020.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
October 30, 2020 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff Deodre Cotton. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING FURTHER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The parties have filed the required Joint Report of Counsel Re: Scheduling Order (the "Joint Report"). Dkt. #39 . Based on a review of the Joint Report, which reflects the parties' ongoing collaborative efforts as to case management, and their observation that an additional "60 to 90 days will better inform the decision to establish realistic case management deadlines," id. at 3, a scheduling conference is set for November 9, 2020 at 11 :00 a.m. All counsel shall meet and confer and file an updated joint status report by October 30, 2020 that sets forth any updates to the parties' respective and/or collective views as to the issues addressed in the Joint Report. See minute order for details. (lom)
August 25, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #37 filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Sutherland, Kevin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT of JOINT REPORT OF COUNSEL RE: SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Lewis, Autumn)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF LIAISON COUNSEL AND DISCOVERY COUNSEL (DKT. #35 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Joint Report is GRANTED as follows: Pursuant to the Joint Report, Matthew S. McNicholas and Jeffrey R. Lamb, of the law firm of McNicholas and McNicholas, LLP shall act as Liaison Counsel on behalf of the non-class related Plaintiffs. (See order for specifics). (et)
August 11, 2020 Filing 37 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Roxanda Yancor, Frankie Lomas(Marchino, Filippo)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE STIPULATED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (DKT. #34 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Motion is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs may file the First Amended Complaint ("FAC") attached as Exhibit A to the Motion. It shall be filed within 5 days of the entry of this Order. Defendant shall file a response within 14 days thereafter. (et)
August 10, 2020 Filing 35 JOINT REPORT of Case Management filed by Plaintiffs Lisette Barajas, Deodre Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by plaintiff Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redlined First Amended Class Action Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Marchino, Filippo)
July 27, 2020 Filing 33 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The scheduling conference is held telephonically. The Court directs counsel for all "personal injury" plaintiffs (i.e., all above-captioned plaintiffs except for plaintiffs in the Lomas action) to meet and confer and file a joint report by 8/10/2020. The August 10 joint report shall address the selection of liaison counsel as well as lead counsel for the purposes of discovery only (if any). If an agreement is not reached, the joint report shall include a proposed process pursuant to which the Court would designate such counsel. Assuming that agreed upon liaison counsel are identified in the August 10 report, all counsel shall meetand confer and file a joint report by August 24, 2020 that sets forth the parties respective and/or collective as to an efficient discovery process. The Court consolidates the cases for pretrial purposes. Case No. LA CV20-00786 JAK (SKx) Frankie Lomas, et al. v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al. is designated the LEAD CASE. All future filings shall be made in the docket of the Lead Case only as follows: All documents filed in this consolidation action shall bear the following caption. Case Nos. LA CV20-02089 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-03116 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-04424 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-04509 JAK (SKx), LA CV20-05124 JAK (SKx), and LA CV20-06182 JAK (SKx) are ordered administratively closed. Counsel shall refrain from filing any documents in the related/consolidated case(s) as of the date of this Order. All filings are to be made in the Lead Case only. In light of the consolidation of the cases for pretrial purposes, the Court waives the requirement for counsel to file pro hac vice applications in each of the underlying cases until the reopening of an individual case for the purpose of trial, if any. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS. (jp) Modified on 7/28/2020 (jp).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING A TELEPHONIC HEARING FOR THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, AND CHANGING THE TIME by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the Scheduling Conference set for July 27, 2020 will proceed by telephone only. No in-person appearances will be allowed. Additionally, on the Court's own motion, the TIME of the conference is changed from 8:30 a.m. to 9:15 a.m. The Deputy Clerk will email telephonic instructions to counsel of record on or before Friday, July 24, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 20, 2020 Filing 31 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial tbd, filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc... (Lewis, Autumn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Filippo Marchino counsel for Plaintiffs Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. Damon L. Rogers is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Frankie Lomas and Roxanda Yancor. (Marchino, Filippo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Filippo Marchino counsel for Plaintiffs Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. Adding Carlos Colorado as counsel of record for Frankie Lomas and Roxanda Yancor for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Frankie Lomas and Roxanda Yancor. (Marchino, Filippo)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCES by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Based on a review of the Joint Reports #25 , the Scheduling Conferences set for 6/1/2020 are continued to 7/27/2020. On or before 7/20/2020 for the Lomas, Barajas, and Cotton actions, to be held along with the Scheduling Conferences previously set in the related cases Erik Garcia v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al. (No. 20-4424) and Jacqueline M. Thomas Pait, et al v. Delta Air Lines Inc., et al. (No. 20-4509, a Joint Report shall be filed in each of these cases; provided, however, to serve judicial and party efficiency and to expedite review, the Joint Reports shall be identical. The process for preparing the contents of the Joint Reports are set forth below. In light of this process, the original deadline for the Rule 16(b)/26(f) Joint Reports in the Garcia and Thomas actions is VACATED. The Joint Report shall be filed after a meet and confer process among all counsel in these five actions as well as counsel in any new actions that may be filed or removed, and then transferred to this Court as related cases. (jp)
May 26, 2020 Filing 27 PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Plaintiffs Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor (Marchino, Filippo)
May 22, 2020 Filing 26 DELTA AIR LINES, INC.'S AMENDED NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc., identifying Delta Air Lines, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Delta Air Lines, Inc.Aero Assurance Ltd.;Air4 Passenger Service Systems, LLC;DAL Europe C.V.;DAL Foreign Holdings, C.V.;DAL Global Technology Hub LLP;DAL Leasing Limited;Delta Air Lines and Pan American World Airways Unterstutzungskasse GMBH;Delta Air Lines Dublin Limited;Delta Air Lines Private Limited;Delta Flight Products, LLC;Delta Gift Cards, Inc.;Delta India Investments I, LLC;Delta India Investments II, LLC;Delta International Aircraft Leasing Limited;Delta Material Services, LLC;Delta Professional Services, LLC;Delta Receivables, LLC;Delta Sky Club, Inc.;Delta TATL UK Limited;Delta Vacations, LLC;DL International Enterprises, LLC;DL Investment Partners, LP;Endeavor Air, Inc.;Epsilon Trading, LLC;MIPC, LLC;Monroe Energy, LLC;Montana Enterprises, Inc.;New Sky, Ltd.;Northwest Airlines, LLC;NW Red Baron LLC;TATL Services BV;Various insurance underwriters in the insurance market; andPlaintiff Frankie Lomas; and Plaintiff Roxanda Yancor. (Lewis, Autumn)
May 20, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT of JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. (Marchino, Filippo)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: GRANTING #23 Non-Resident Attorney David F Knapp APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc., designating Autumn E Lewis as local counsel. (jp)
May 12, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David F. Knapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26421566) filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Autumn)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE REQUEST OF DELTA AIR LINES, INC. TO CONTINUE 5/8/2020 DEADLINE FOR FILING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND THE ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER (NO. 20-786, DKT. #19 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Request is GRANTED-IN-PART. The parties in Lomas, Barajas, and Cotton shall file their respective Joint Reports on or before 5/20/2020. Therefore, the deadline for the Lomas Joint Report is CONTINUED from 5/8/2020, and the deadlines for the Barajas and Cotton Joint Reports are ADVANCED from 5/29/2020 and 6/12/2020, respectively. The Joint Reports shall be filed after a meet and confer process among all counsel in the three actions to seek to establish an efficient means of conducting discovery that will be common to all of them. The Scheduling Conference for each of the three actions is set for 6/1/2020 at 8:30 AM. Upon review of the Joint Reports, a determination will be made as to whether a hearing is necessary or if the scheduling process will be taken under submission with a separate order issued in each action. (jp)
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY RESPONSE TO LOMAS PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO REQUEST OF DELTA AIR LINES. INC. TO CONTINUE MAY 8, 2020 DEADLINE FOR FILING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT REQUEST to Continue MAY 8, 2020 DEADLINE FOR FILING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND THE ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER from May 8, 2020 to After the hearing of Delta's Motion to Consolidate #19 filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Lewis, Autumn)
May 2, 2020 Filing 20 Plaintiff's Opposition to Request of Delta Air Lines, Inc. yes re: REQUEST to Continue MAY 8, 2020 DEADLINE FOR FILING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND THE ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER from May 8, 2020 to After the hearing of Delta's Motion to Consolidate #19 filed by Plaintiffs Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. (Marchino, Filippo)
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 REQUEST to Continue MAY 8, 2020 DEADLINE FOR FILING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT AND THE ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER from May 8, 2020 to After the hearing of Delta's Motion to Consolidate filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Autumn)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #14 , #17 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J Ellis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc., designating Autumm E Lewis as local counsel. (jp)
March 3, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 3/2/2020, Receipt No. 25572459) filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Autumn)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25572459) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. CM and the State Bar have local counsel listed in San Francisco. Application has attorney in LA. (Thrasher, Lupe)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 Amendment to First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25572459) #14 Notice of Errata to Include the Certificate of Good Standing to the Application of Jeffrey J. Ellis filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Lewis, Autumn)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25572459) filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Autumn)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey J Ellis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jp)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/8/2020. (cw)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc., identifying Delta Air Lines, Inc.;Subsidiaries of Delta Air Lines, Inc.:. (Lewis, Autumn)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Attorney Autumn Elizabeth Lewis added to party Delta Air Lines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lewis, Autumn)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor, upon Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky Deceage, Corporation Service Company for Delta Airlines, Inc. in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Marchino, Filippo)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. (car)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. (Marchino, Filippo)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. (Marchino, Filippo)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Marchino, Filippo)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25190296 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Frankie Lomas, Roxanda Yancor. (Attorney Filippo Marchino added to party Frankie Lomas(pty:pla), Attorney Filippo Marchino added to party Roxanda Yancor(pty:pla))(Marchino, Filippo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Lomas
Represented By: Filippo Marchino
Represented By: Carlos X Colorado
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gray
Represented By: Damon Rogers
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanda Yancor
Represented By: Filippo Marchino
Represented By: Carlos X Colorado
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gray
Represented By: Damon Rogers
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. P.
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisette Barajas
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Allan L Bridgford, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: John Charles Carpenter
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Renee Mochkatel
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anabel Samperio
Represented By: Renee Mochkatel
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Allan L Bridgford, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: John Charles Carpenter
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Guzman
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Allan L Bridgford, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: John Charles Carpenter
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Renee Mochkatel
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana De La Torre
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: John Charles Carpenter
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Renee Mochkatel
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Allan L Bridgford, III
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deodre Cotton
Represented By: Babak Lalezari
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Garcia
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Garcia
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. A. G.
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika A. Garcia
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. G. G.
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Perez
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Flores
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X. B.
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Rojas
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Bustamante
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Ramos
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brayant Rivas
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. R.
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. A.
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milvia Nivety Torres
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Torres
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Rene Torres
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Flores
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Lopez
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Avila
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Avila
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. L.
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C. F.
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aracely Monroy De Flores
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Vierna
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Morales
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Morales-Vierna
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeny Benitez
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Benitez
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B.
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. B.
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gabriela Vasquez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Vasquez
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Vasquez
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Borquez
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Christian Beza-Lara
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Morales
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline M Thomas Pait
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anson Bevans
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Jenos Firouznam-Heidari
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Castillo
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Neama Rahmani
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Shawn Siavash Rokni
Represented By: Houman Sayaghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Amah
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Kimberly Elise Barreto
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Avant
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Kimberly Elise Barreto
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A. Flores
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Kimberly Elise Barreto
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Jimenez
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Kimberly Elise Barreto
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Lee
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Represented By: Kimberly Elise Barreto
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Langston
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Kimberly Elise Barreto
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiola Mejia
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Kimberly Elise Barreto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. R.
Represented By: Alan J. Jackson
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Caleb E. Mason
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Kimberly Elise Barreto
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rivera
Represented By: Antony Artur Thomassian
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Ricardo Y Merluza
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Dana Merluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Ayala
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Christine Chalhoub Zaouk
Represented By: Evan M Selik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. H.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Areli Rosas Felix
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Partida
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Partida
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Partida
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Partida
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laisha Partida
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Gutierrez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Leonel Carmona
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Carmona
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Josue Carmona
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Cornejo
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marleny Cornejo
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Urbina
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staphny Sarahy Torres
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Feliz Torres
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Lidia Torres
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Gabriel Torres
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse De La Torre
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel De La Torre
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Rocio Martinez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Morales Garcia
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Angelo Morales
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Morales Martinez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Jacob Morales Martinez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Bustamante
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Bustamante
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Bustamante
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Guadalupe Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cenovio Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalia Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymundo Perez Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Castillo
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Fernandez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Fernandez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fernandez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Camacho
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Gallegos
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Gallegos
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Gonzalez Flores
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Alberto Flores
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Nicole Flores
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Alberto Flores
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Peniel Flores
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Laura Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. F.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. F.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. F.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. F.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. F.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizet Flores
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Diaz
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilia Herrera
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Herrera
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Escobar
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. D.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. D.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Eschevarria Vivas
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. V.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larronda Williams
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Aguilera
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Belman
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Belman
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Covarrubias
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Duran
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Garrison
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Gonzalez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hartley
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hynson
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. J.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Jaime
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. J.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizet Leon
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Loera
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Mahoney
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Medina
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. M.
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. M.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Mejia
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Morales
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Ovalle
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Peoples
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Quintero
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Reyes
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. R.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Taylor
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. T.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. T.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juvetino Torres
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Valencia
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Valle
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Vasquez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. W.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Yancovich
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. W.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. W.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C.
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. D.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. E.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. G.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. G.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. M.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. P.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Q.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. T.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. T.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Aguilar
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Aguilera
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Aguilera
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Aguilera
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Canto
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Rosa Castro
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Cervantes
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Duarte
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriella Eulloqui
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Figueroa
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Godinez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Eliza Gonzalez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilliana Gonzalez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Manuel Guerra
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiola Inzunza
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azie L. Jones
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coretta Jones
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lizarraga
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Lopez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Melendez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Murillo
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martina Baeza Murray
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Navarro-Gutierrez
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cenorina De Pedraza Aquino
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pedraza Aquino
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilo Pedraza Castillo
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline Pedraza
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alvarado Perez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Perez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Quintero
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Quintero
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edelmina Ramos
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estrella Ramos
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Melendez
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lubia Sanchez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Sanchez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Serrano
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Serrano
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Rosa Tamayo
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deisy Tomas
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid C. Villeda
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontranail Warren
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Rosales
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. R.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. R.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Ordorica
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Beal
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Retana
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Santos
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Solis
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Zendejas Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Zendejas
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Alvarado
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Veronica Alvarado
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Robbin Lamb
Represented By: Samuel G Hutchins
Represented By: Sophia Brigitte Arim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Ornelas
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Lopez
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sanchez Avila
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. V.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. P.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. O.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. S.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. R.
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt |