Gondola Adventures, Inc. et al v. Gavin Newsom et al
Plaintiff: WILDFIRE INC., a California Corporation dba WILDFIRE LIGHTING, GONDOLA ADVENTURES, INC, KINGS PET GROOMING, INC., a California Corporation dba KINGs MOBILE PET SPA, SOL DE MEXICO, INC., a California Corporation dba CIELITO LINDO RESTAURANT, HERNANDEZ PRODUCTIONS, INC., YBANZ GONZALEZ INC., a California Corporation dba LA SIRENITA, YREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC, Sol De Mexico, Inc., Ybanz Gonzalez Inc., Kings Pet Grooming, Inc., Hernandez Productions, Inc, Gondola Adventures, Inc., Wildfire Inc., Wildfire Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Wildfire Lighting, Sol De Mexico, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Cielito Lindo Restaurant, Ybanz Gonzalez Inc. a California Corporation doing business as La Sirenita and Kings Pet Grooming, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Kings Mobile pet Spa
Defendant: Sheriff Alex Villanueva, Sonia Y Angell, Donald P Wagner, Dr. Levin Robert, Janice Hahn, Doug Chaffee, Hilda L. Solis, Linda Parks, Perez V. Manuel, Kevin Jeffries, Xavier Becerra, Karen Spiegel, Don Barnes, Kathryn Barger, Cameron Kaiser, Sheriff William Ayub, Mayor Eric Michael Garcetti, Barbara Ferrer, Chad Bianco, Sheila Kuehl, John Zaragoza, Bob Huber, Kelly Long, Mark Ridley-Thomas, Michelle Steel, Jeff Hewitt, Dr. Nichole Quick, Lisa Bartlett, Steve Bennett, Chuck Washington, Governor Gavin Christopher Newsom, Andrew Do, Alex Villanueva, Donald Wagner, V. Manuel Perez, Gavin Newsom, William Ayub, Dr. Robert Levin, Eric Garcetti, Sonia Y. Angell, MD, MPH and Hilda Solis
Case Number: 2:2020cv03789
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Gondola Adventures, Inc., Hernandez Productions, Inc, Kings Pet Grooming, Inc., Sol De Mexico, Inc., Wildfire Inc., Ybanz Gonzalez Inc., Yreka Food Enterprises, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Geragos, Mark)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Sonia Y. Angell, MD, MPH, William Ayub, Kathryn Barger, Don Barnes, Lisa Bartlett, Xavier Becerra, Steve Bennett, Chad Bianco, Doug Chaffee, Andrew Do, Barbara Ferrer, Eric Garcetti, Janice Hahn, Jeff Hewitt, Bob Huber, Kevin Jeffries, Cameron Kaiser, Sheila Kuehl, Robert Levin, Kelly Long, Gavin Newsom, Linda Parks, V. Manuel Perez, Nichole Quick, Mark Ridley-Thomas, Hilda Solis, Karen Spiegel, Michelle Steel, Alex Villanueva, Donald Wagner, Chuck Washington, John Zaragoza. (shb)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Gondola Adventures, Inc., Hernandez Productions, Inc, Kings Pet Grooming, Inc., Sol De Mexico, Inc., Wildfire Inc., Ybanz Gonzalez Inc., Yreka Food Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1, #2 Attachment #2)(Geragos, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other), #7 , Notice (Other) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings - Select - Errata. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Errata to Certification & Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Gondola Adventures, Inc., Hernandez Productions, Inc, Kings Pet Grooming, Inc., Sol De Mexico, Inc., Wildfire Inc., Ybanz Gonzalez Inc., Yreka Food Enterprises, LLC. (Geragos, Mark)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Errata to Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Gondola Adventures, Inc., Hernandez Productions, Inc, Kings Pet Grooming, Inc., Sol De Mexico, Inc., Wildfire Inc., Ybanz Gonzalez Inc., Yreka Food Enterprises, LLC. (Geragos, Mark)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Geragos, Mark)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs GONDOLA ADVENTURES, INC, HERNANDEZ PRODUCTIONS, INC., KINGS PET GROOMING, INC., a California Corporation dba KINGs MOBILE PET SPA, SOL DE MEXICO, INC., a California Corporation dba CIELITO LINDO RESTAURANT, WILDFIRE INC., a California Corporation dba WILDFIRE LIGHTING, YBANZ GONZALEZ INC., a California Corporation dba LA SIRENITA, YREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Geragos, Mark)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26220905 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs YREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC, HERNANDEZ PRODUCTIONS, INC., GONDOLA ADVENTURES, INC, YBANZ GONZALEZ INC., a California Corporation dba LA SIRENITA, SOL DE MEXICO, INC., a California Corporation dba CIELITO LINDO RESTAURANT, KINGS PET GROOMING, INC., a California Corporation dba KINGs MOBILE PET SPA, WILDFIRE INC., a California Corporation dba WILDFIRE LIGHTING. (Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party GONDOLA ADVENTURES, INC(pty:pla), Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party HERNANDEZ PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party KINGS PET GROOMING, INC., a California Corporation dba KINGs MOBILE PET SPA(pty:pla), Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party SOL DE MEXICO, INC., a California Corporation dba CIELITO LINDO RESTAURANT(pty:pla), Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party WILDFIRE INC., a California Corporation dba WILDFIRE LIGHTING(pty:pla), Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party YBANZ GONZALEZ INC., a California Corporation dba LA SIRENITA(pty:pla), Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party YREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC(pty:pla))(Geragos, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gondola Adventures, Inc. et al v. Gavin Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDFIRE INC., a California Corporation dba WILDFIRE LIGHTING
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GONDOLA ADVENTURES, INC
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINGS PET GROOMING, INC., a California Corporation dba KINGs MOBILE PET SPA
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOL DE MEXICO, INC., a California Corporation dba CIELITO LINDO RESTAURANT
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERNANDEZ PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YBANZ GONZALEZ INC., a California Corporation dba LA SIRENITA
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YREKA FOOD ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sol De Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ybanz Gonzalez Inc.
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kings Pet Grooming, Inc.
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernandez Productions, Inc
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gondola Adventures, Inc.
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildfire Inc.
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildfire Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Wildfire Lighting
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sol De Mexico, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Cielito Lindo Restaurant
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ybanz Gonzalez Inc. a California Corporation doing business as La Sirenita
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kings Pet Grooming, Inc. a California Corporation doing business as Kings Mobile pet Spa
Represented By: Harmeet K Dhillon
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Mark P Meuser
Represented By: Nitoj P Singh
Represented By: Mark John Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Alex Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Y Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald P Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Levin Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Chaffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda L. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez V. Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff William Ayub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Eric Michael Garcetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ferrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Bianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Kuehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ridley-Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nichole Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Gavin Christopher Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Manuel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ayub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Garcetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Y. Angell, MD, MPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?