James Michael Fayed v. Gavin Newsom et al
Petitioner: James Michael Fayed
Respondent: Gavin Newsom, Office of the Attorney General for the State of California and Los Angeles County of
Case Number: 2:2022cv01303
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for an Extension to File a First Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: Plaintiff shall file the FAC no later than May 9, 2022. All other provisions of the March 10, 2022 Order remain in effect. Granting #10 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File. [See Order for additional information.] (es)
March 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File First Amended Complaint filed by petitioner James Michael Fayed. (es)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Screening Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint with Leave to Amend by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: or the above reasons, the Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. If Plaintiff intends to pursue this matter, he shall file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") by April 11, 2022. Plaintiff is advised that a FAC would entirely replace the Complaint in this action. re: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 See document for details. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 of 2, #2 Attachment 2 of 2) (es)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is hereby GRANTED. Granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Appear In Forma Pauperis. (es)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 24, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/1/2022.]
February 24, 2022 case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/1/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement (CDCR Inmate Statement Report) filed by James Michael Fayed. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/1/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by James Michael Fayed. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/1/2022.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 Prisoner's Application and Declaration for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Michael Fayed, CDCR #AK3340. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/1/2022.] Modified on 3/1/2022 (ghap).
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) (no process) against County of Los Angeles, Gavin Newsom, Office of the Attorney General for the State of California, (Filing Fee: ifpp entered 2/17/2022). Filed byJames Michael Fayed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Michael Fayed v. Gavin Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Michael Fayed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of the Attorney General for the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Los Angeles County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?