Steven Rupp et al v. Xavier Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Alfonso Valencia, Steven Rupp, Troy Willis, Cheryl Johnson, Steven Dember, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Christopher Seifert, Michael Jones, Douglas Grassey and Dennis Martin
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Does 1-10
Amicus Curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety, Giffords Law Center, Brady and National Association of Social Workers
Case Number: 8:2017cv00746
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05/31/2019, 10:57 a.m. re Transcript #122 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dpa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 6, 2019 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05/31/2019, 10:57 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2020. (dpa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Transcript (CV), #119 . Page 6, 15: "Freeman" revised "Friedman"; Page 7, 14: added [sic]; Page 13, 8, added "grip"; and Page 13, 16:added [sic] and page 17, 16, added [sic]. Revised Transcript is uploaded. (dpa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05/31/2019, 10:57 a.m. re Transcript #119 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dpa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 5, 2019 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05/31/2019, 10:57 a.m. Court Reporter: Deborah D. Parker, CSR 10342, phone number transcripts@ddparker.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through DEBORAHDPARKER.COM or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2020. (dpa)
September 25, 2019 Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 19-56004, as to Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis for Court Reporter. Court will contact Laura Palmerin at lpalmerin@michellawyers.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Brady, Sean)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING REQUEST for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Sean A Brady for Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis in place and stead of Peter A Patterson, Nicole F Reaves #116 . (jp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 116 REQUEST of Peter A. Patterson and Nicole Frazer Reaves to Withdraw as Attorney California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Patterson, Peter)
August 28, 2019 Filing 115 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-56004 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #114 as to plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (jp)
August 27, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. Appeal of Judgment, #111 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24336061.) (Brady, Sean)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay Litigation of Costs Pending Appeal #112 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that all proceedings regarding costs in this action shall be stayed until 30 days after the completion of all appellate proceedings. (jp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 112 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Litigation of Costs from 8/14/2019 to 30 days after completion of all appellate proceedings filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brady, Sean)
July 31, 2019 Filing 111 JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine L. Staton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs shall take nothing by way of their Third Amended Complaint from Defendant Xavier Becerra. Each and every claim and prayer for relief asserted in Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint is denied. Defendant is the prevailing party and shall be entitled to recover reasonable costs of suit. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 110 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging #109 Proposed Judgment filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Brady, Sean)
July 26, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #108 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment, #2 Certificate of Service)(Echeverria, John)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING Attorney General's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #73 ) and DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #77 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court GRANTS the Attorney General's Motion for Summary Judgment and DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Attorney General is ORDERED to submit a proposed judgment no later than five (5) days from the date of this Order. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
May 31, 2019 Filing 107 MINUTES OF Hearing re Defendant Xavier Becerra's Motion for Summary Judgment #73 , and Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment #77 before Judge Josephine L. Staton: Hearing held. Matters taken under submission by the Court. Defendant's request to vacate all pending 0dates is GRANTED. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness Michael Mersereau filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. Motion set for hearing on 7/5/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #3 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
May 28, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness John J. Donohue filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. Motion set for hearing on 7/5/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #3 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
May 28, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness Christopher B. Colwell, M.D. filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. Motion set for hearing on 7/5/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #3 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
May 28, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness Lucy P. Allen filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. Motion set for hearing on 7/5/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #3 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
May 17, 2019 Filing 102 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean A. Brady)(Brady, Sean)
May 17, 2019 Filing 101 STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Materials Fact re Plaintiffs' Additional Undisputed Material Facts [92-1] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
May 17, 2019 Filing 100 Supplemental Objections to Evidence in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
May 17, 2019 Filing 99 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint #73 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING MOTION of Brady and The National Association of Social Workers for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment #97 . (jp)
May 9, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amici curiae Brady, National Association of Social Workers. Motion set for hearing on 5/31/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae Brady and National Association of Social Workers, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Devon Mobley-Ritter added to party Brady(pty:am), Attorney Devon Mobley-Ritter added to party National Association of Social Workers(pty:am)) (Mobley-Ritter, Devon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Sean A. Brady in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint #73 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 49, #2 Exhibit 50, #3 Exhibit 51-52, #4 Exhibit 53 part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit 53 part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit 54, #7 Exhibit 55, #8 Exhibit 56, #9 Exhibit 57, #10 Exhibit 58-62, #11 Exhibit 63, #12 Exhibit 64-69)(Brady, Sean)
May 2, 2019 Filing 95 DECLARATION of Sean A. Brady in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint #73 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Brady, Sean)
May 2, 2019 Filing 94 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Brady, Sean)
May 2, 2019 Filing 93 Objections to Evidence filed in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint #73 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Brady, Sean)
May 2, 2019 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint #73 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and Additional Uncontroverted Facts)(Brady, Sean)
May 2, 2019 Filing 91 Objections to Evidence Filed in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
May 2, 2019 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Peter H. Chang in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46)(Chang, Peter)
May 2, 2019 Filing 89 STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact re Plaintiffs' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
May 2, 2019 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
April 26, 2019 Filing 87 STATEMENT Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff Steven Rupp (corrected) (Brady, Sean)
April 26, 2019 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (corrected) filed by Plaintiff Steven Rupp. (Brady, Sean)
April 26, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Steven Rupp. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 and Plaintiffs Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law (Brady, Sean)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING Everytown For Gun Safety's Unopposed Motion for Lave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #82 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING Giffords Law Center's Motion for Lave to participate as Amicus Curiae (Doc. #81 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
April 1, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief Unopposed Motion By Everytown For Gun Safety For Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Amicus Curiae Everytown for Gun Safety. Motion set for hearing on 5/31/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Brief Of Amicus Curiae Everytown For Gun Safety In Support Of Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment, #2 Appendix Of Publically Available Historical Laws, #3 Proposed Order Granting Everytown For Gun Safetys Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment) (Attorney Matthew Eric Sloan added to party Everytown for Gun Safety(pty:am)) (Sloan, Matthew)
April 1, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Proposed Amicus Giffords Law Center. Motion set for hearing on 5/31/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief of Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Scott A Edelman added to party Giffords Law Center(pty:am)) (Edelman, Scott)
March 25, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Brady, Sean)
March 25, 2019 Filing 79 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Brady, Sean)
March 25, 2019 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Sean A. Brady and Exhibits 1-8 in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #77 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9-11 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #2 Exhibit 12-19 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #3 Exhibit 20-21 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #4 Exhibit 22 Part 1 of 4 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #5 Exhibit 22 Part 2 of 4 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #6 Exhibit 22 Part 3 of 4 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #7 Exhibit 22 Part 4 of 4 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #8 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #9 Exhibit 24 Part 1 of 3 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #10 Exhibit 24 Part 2 of 3 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #11 Exhibit 24 Part 3 of 3-26 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #12 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #13 Exhibit 28-44 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady, #14 Exhibit 45-48 to Declaration of Sean A. Brady)(Brady, Sean)
March 25, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to each Claim Asserted in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. Motion set for hearing on 5/31/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration of Steven Rupp, #4 Declaration of Steven Dember, #5 Declaration of Cheryl Johnson, #6 Declaration of Christopher Seifert, #7 Declaration of Alfonso Valencia, #8 Declaration of Troy Willis, #9 Declaration of Michael Jones, #10 Declaration of Dennis Martin, #11 Declaration of Richard Travis) (Brady, Sean)
March 25, 2019 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Peter H. Chang in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint #73 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45)(Chang, Peter)
March 25, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint #73 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Chang, Peter)
March 25, 2019 Filing 74 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts in Support of Defendant's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint #73 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
March 25, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Motion set for hearing on 5/31/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Chang, Peter)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING The Joint Stipulation and Request to Set Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Cross-motions for Summary Judgment #71 by Judge Josephine L. Staton as follows: Motion, opening brief, and supporting papers: 3/25/2019; Opposition brief and supporting papers: 5/2/2019; Reply brief and supporting papers: 5/17/2019. On the date of filing, the moving parties shall notice the motions for the Court's first available motions hearing date, but no earlier than 5/31/2019 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 71 STIPULATION for Order Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation to Continue, #69 . NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. (Motions due by 5/27/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/17/2019. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/2/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton.) (mrgo)
December 28, 2018 Filing 69 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines Re: Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #62 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brady, Sean)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: GRANTING #67 Non-Resident Attorney Peter A Patterson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis, designating Sean A Brady as local counsel. (jp)
December 21, 2018 Filing 67 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter A. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22943162) filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #65 Non-Resident Attorney Nicole F. Reaves APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven Rupp, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc., and Dennis Martin, designating Sean A. Brady as local counsel. (bm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 65 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole F. Reaves to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22859828) filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, GRANTING #63 Non-Resident Attorney John Parker Sweeney APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Rupp, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis, Dennis Martin, and California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, designating Sean A. Brady as local counsel. (es)
November 30, 2018 Filing 63 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Parker Sweeney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22824857) filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Extend Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. #61 The Court having considered the parties' joint stipulation, and good cause having been shown, hereby grants the stipulation and orders that the pretrial schedule is modified as follows: Final Pretrial Conference (1:30 p.m.) May 31, 2019. [See order for further details.] (es)
August 28, 2018 Filing 61 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Discovery & Pretrial Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brady, Sean)
July 6, 2018 Filing 60 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 , filed by Plaintiffs Alfonso Valencia, Cheryl Johnson, Troy Willis, Steven Dember, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Michael Jones, Steven Rupp, Dennis Martin, Christopher Seifert(Brady, Sean)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REGARDING THE JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT #56 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Pursuant to the parties agreement within the Stipulation, Defendant Xavier Becerras deadline to respond to the Third Amended Complaint is July 5, 2018. (es)
July 5, 2018 Filing 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 Third Amended Complaint [56-1] filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra.(Chang, Peter)
June 28, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, #56 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation to File a Third Amended Complaint)(Brady, Sean)
June 27, 2018 Filing 56 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Complaint)(Brady, Sean)
June 13, 2018 Filing 55 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Xavier Becerra answer now due 6/27/2018, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra.(Chang, Peter)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Discovery & Pretrial Deadlines #52 . NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The Court having considered the parties' joint stipulation, and good cause having been shown, hereby grants the stipulation and orders that the pretrial schedule is modified as follows: (see document for details). (dro)
June 8, 2018 Filing 53 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to File, #51 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Brady, Sean)
June 8, 2018 Filing 52 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Discovery & Pretrial Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean A. Brady in Support of the Joint Stipulation to Extend Discovery & Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order)(Brady, Sean)
June 8, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery & Pretrial Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean A. Brady in Support of Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery & Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
May 30, 2018 Filing 50 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Alfonso Valencia, Cheryl Johnson, Troy Willis, Steven Dember, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Michael Jones, Steven Rupp, Dennis Martin, Christopher Seifert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brady, Sean)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 17); (2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Doc. 24); AND (3) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE AS MOOT (Doc. 41) by Judge Josephine L. Staton (es)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Granting Stipulation Modifying Pretrial Schedule #47 . The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled. ( Fact Discovery cut-off 7/13/2018., Motions due by 11/2/2018., Motions in Limine to be filed by 1/21/2019., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/21/2018., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton.) See document for further information. (twdb)
April 3, 2018 Filing 47 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Documents filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brady, Sean)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION (Doc. 41) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration of Dennis Martin in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. #41 Defendants opposed, and Plaintiffs replied. (Opp., Doc. 42; Reply, Doc. 44.) The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for March 9, 2018, at 2:30 p.m., is VACATED, and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. (dv)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Granting Stipulation #43 . Court hereby ORDERS that This case is exempt from the ADR Program; and The Order/Referral to ADR (Dkt. No. #39 ) is hereby vacated. (mt)
February 23, 2018 Filing 44 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Declaration of Dennis Martin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #41 filed by Plaintiff Steven Rupp. (Brady, Sean)
February 22, 2018 Filing 43 STIPULATION for Relief from ADR Program re Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) #39 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter)
February 16, 2018 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Declaration of Dennis Martin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #41 Defendant filed by Defendants Xavier Becerra, Does. (Attorney John D Echeverria added to party Does(pty:dft))(Echeverria, John)
February 6, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Declaration of Dennis Martin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean A. Brady in Support of Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration of Dennis Martin, #2 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
December 22, 2017 Filing 40 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Josephine L. Staton: taking under advisement #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; taking under advisement #17 MOTION to Dismiss ; Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 23, 2018. (tg)
December 19, 2017 Filing 38 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER (tg)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Courts own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing December 22, 2017 is VACATED and taken off calendar. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/21/2018 at 1:30 p.m. See document for further dates and details. (tg)
December 5, 2017 Filing 36 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the hearings on Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss #17 and Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 , set for December 15, 2017, at 2;30 p.m., are CONTINUED to December 22, 2017, at 2:30 p.m.; and the Scheduling Conference currently set for December 15, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., is reset to December 22, 2017, at 1:30 p.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (es) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 1, 2017 Filing 35 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re California Penal Code section 30900, subdv. (b) . Motion #24 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean A. Brady in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Brady, Sean)
December 1, 2017 Filing 34 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Brady, Sean)
December 1, 2017 Filing 33 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Takings Clause and Due Process Clause Claims #17 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
November 28, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John D Echeverria on behalf of Defendant Xavier Becerra (Attorney John D Echeverria added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Echeverria, John)
November 27, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration (Motion related) #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lwag)
November 22, 2017 Filing 30 DECLARATION of John D. Echeverria in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re California Penal Code section 30900, subdv. (b) . Motion #24 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Chang, Peter)
November 22, 2017 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Patrick Plant in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re California Penal Code section 30900, subdv. (b) . Motion #24 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
November 22, 2017 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Blake Graham in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re California Penal Code section 30900, subdv. (b) . Motion #24 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Chang, Peter)
November 22, 2017 Filing 27 Defendant's OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re California Penal Code section 30900, subdv. (b) . Motion #24 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Chang, Peter)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff Douglas Grassey #23 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court having considered the parties' stipulation and good cause having been shown, hereby orders as follows: Plaintiff Douglas Grassey is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, from this action in its entirety, which dismissal shall not prejudice any claims, allegations, or relief being pursued by any other Plaintiff as to any Defendant. (lwag)
November 15, 2017 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re California Penal Code section 30900, subdv. (b) . Motion #24 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Douglas Grassey, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I)(Brady, Sean)
November 14, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re California Penal Code section 30900, subdv. (b) . Motion filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Douglas Grassey, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. Motion set for hearing on 12/15/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Richard Travis in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of James Curcuruto in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Stephen Helsley in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration of Dennis Martin in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Proposed Order) (Brady, Sean)
November 14, 2017 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Douglas Grassey filed by Plaintiffs Alfonso Valencia, Cheryl Johnson, Troy Willis, Steven Dember, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Douglas Grassey, Michael Jones, Steven Rupp, Dennis Martin, Christopher Seifert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brady, Sean)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation #20 . Pursuant to the parties Stipulation, the Court hereby ORDERS that: The hearing on Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss is continued to December 15, 2017, at 2:30 p.m.; and The scheduling conference currently set for December 1, 2017, at 1:30p.m. is reset to December 15, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. (mba)
November 9, 2017 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Takings Clause and Due Process Clause Claims #17 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Douglas Grassey, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Attorney Sean Anthony Brady added to party Douglas Grassey(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Anthony Brady added to party Dennis Martin(pty:pla))(Brady, Sean)
November 8, 2017 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Scheduling Conference from December 1, 2017 to December 15, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Takings Clause and Due Process Clause Claims #17 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #19 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 12/1/2017 at 1:30 PM. See document for further details. (tg)
October 5, 2017 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Takings Clause and Due Process Clause Claims #17 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Chang, Peter)
October 5, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Takings Clause and Due Process Clause Claims filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. Motion set for hearing on 12/1/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chang, Peter)
September 11, 2017 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Alfonso Valencia, Cheryl Johnson, Troy Willis, Steven Dember, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Michael Jones, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert(Brady, Sean)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend #14 . Plaintiffs may amend the Original Complaint on or before September 11, 2017; (twdb)
September 1, 2017 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Peter)
August 8, 2017 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Xavier Becerra answer now due 9/11/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra.(Attorney Peter H Chang added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft))(Chang, Peter)
August 4, 2017 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs timely-filed Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint in response to the Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause issued July 31, 2017 is hereby DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 1, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Alfonso Valencia, Cheryl Johnson, Troy Willis, Steven Dember, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Michael Jones, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, upon Defendant Xavier Becerra acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2017, answer due 8/10/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Peter Chang, Deputy Attorney General. (Michel, Carl)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Josephine L. Staton: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Counsel is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 7, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution.( Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2017.) (twdb)
April 26, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Michel, Carl)
April 26, 2017 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
April 26, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
April 26, 2017 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra. (car)
April 26, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 26, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
April 24, 2017 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Michel, Carl)
April 24, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis. (Michel, Carl)
April 24, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19739726 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Alfonso Valencia, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Rupp, Michael Jones, Cheryl Johnson, Troy Willis, Steven Dember, Christopher Seifert. (Attorney Carl Dawson Michel added to party California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated(pty:pla), Attorney Carl Dawson Michel added to party Steven Dember(pty:pla), Attorney Carl Dawson Michel added to party Cheryl Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Carl Dawson Michel added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Carl Dawson Michel added to party Steven Rupp(pty:pla), Attorney Carl Dawson Michel added to party Christopher Seifert(pty:pla), Attorney Carl Dawson Michel added to party Alfonso Valencia(pty:pla), Attorney Carl Dawson Michel added to party Troy Willis(pty:pla))(Michel, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Rupp et al v. Xavier Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Valencia
Represented By: Matthew Dunbar Cubeiro
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rupp
Represented By: Matthew Dunbar Cubeiro
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Willis
Represented By: Matthew Dunbar Cubeiro
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Dunbar Cubeiro
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dember
Represented By: Matthew Dunbar Cubeiro
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew Dunbar Cubeiro
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Seifert
Represented By: Matthew Dunbar Cubeiro
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Matthew Dunbar Cubeiro
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Grassey
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Martin
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Nicole F Reaves
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter H Chang
Represented By: John D Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: John D Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: Matthew Eric Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Giffords Law Center
Represented By: Scott A Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brady
Represented By: Devon Mobley-Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Social Workers
Represented By: Devon Mobley-Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?