Hunter v. Youngblood et al

Plaintiff: Leroy D. Hunter
Defendant: Donny Youngblood, - Hinojosa, P Davis, - Mann and Edward R. Jagels
Case Number: 1:2007cv00373
Filed: March 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISMISSING Action, With Prejudice, For Failure To Prosecute, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/13/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING 45 , 54 Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/15/2011. Plaintiff's Opposition or Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel due by 3/21/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/21/2010 requiring Plaintiff to file opposition or statement of no opposition to 38 MOTION to DISMISS. (Filing Deadline: 10/25/2010). (Lundstrom, T)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/10/2010 recommending that 28 MOTION for Writ of Transport, 33 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL and 36 MOTION And Request For Court Order be DENIED. Objections to F&R due by 9/13/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS of October 29, 2009 23 ; ORDER Providing Plaintiff Another Opportunity to Comply With the Court's Order; ORDER for Clerk to Send Plaintiff Another Copy of the Court's Order of September 3, 2009, and the Service Documents for Plaintiff to Complete and Return to the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/4/10. (Hellings, J)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 {VACATED PER ORDER 27 } FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending to Dismiss Case for Failure to Obey a Court Order 19 ; Objections, if any, due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/29/2009. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/1/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER for this Action to Proceed Only Against Defendant Hinojosa for Excessive Force Under the due Process Clause, and Dismissing all Remaining Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/01/2009. Defendants Mann; Donny Youngblood; P Davis and Edward R. Jagels terminated from action. (Flores, E)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed only against Officer Hinojosa, for excessive force under the Due Process Clause; all remaining claims and defendants be DISMISSED from this action;Plaintiff's claims against defe ndants Kern County Sheriff Donny Youngblood, OfficerP. Davis, Deputy Sheriff Sergeant Mann, and District Attorney Edward R. Jagels be DISMISSED from this action based on Plaintiff's failure to state any claims upon which relief may be granted ag ainst them; Plaintiff's claims for equal protection, supervisory liability, and malicious prosecution be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted under section1983; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/03/2009. (Objections to F&R due by 10/6/2009) (Martin, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Youngblood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward R. Jagels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy D. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?