Adler v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Brent Adler
Defendant: W. J. Sullivan, Fernando Gonzalez, Carrasco, M. Bryant, Emerson, K. Large, J. Ramos, T. Steadman, M. Stainer and P. Jones
Case Number: 1:2010cv01269
Filed: July 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Dismissing Action, with Prejudice, pursuant to Parties' Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/9/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED ORDER Following Settlement, and Vacating Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/17/14. Telephonic Status Conference re Settlement Funds set for 9/16/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Verduzco, M)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Following Settlement, Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/16/14.(30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Defendants' 45 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Staying Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/30/14. (Gonzalez, R)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Sullivan, 39 and 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/28/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING Case to Prisoner Settlement Program and Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/26/2014. ( Settlement Conference set for 6/12/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone)(Copy of this order mailed to Sujean Park, ADR) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Adopting 31 Findings and Recommendations, Denying Defendants Large and Noyce's 16 Motion to Dismiss, and Requiring They File an Answer; ORDER Denying Defendants Bryant, Carrasco, Gonzalez and Steadman's 30 Motion to Dismiss, wihtout Prejudice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/5/13. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants Large and Noyce's 16 Motion to Dismiss be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/9/13. Referred to Judge Ishii. Twenty-Day Objection Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING 14 Notice of Waiver and Requiring Defendants to Comply with Court Order within Fifteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/19/2012. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adler v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?