Stewart v. Holland et al
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Stewart
Defendant: K. Holland, M. Bryant, V. Serna, T. Langhardt, K. Nowels, V. Cortez, S. Carey, P. Grant, P. Matzen, I. Alomari, Matthew Cate, D. Duncan and R. Hoover
Case Number: 1:2014cv00322
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Regarding Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41 77 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2019. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Regarding Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant P. Nixon with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/27/2019. P. Nixon terminated.(Martin-Gill, S)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second Ex Parte Request to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/26/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second 70 Motion for Order to Receive Unimpeded Access to Law Library or Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/25/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING 65 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Receive Unimpeded Access to Law Library or Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/17/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 59 Motion to Submit Administrative 602 Exhaustion to Defendants and to Court as a Exhibit, verifying exhaustion; ORDER regarding Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/16/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants for Violating Orders, Denying Plaintiff a Settlement or Fair Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/5/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 56 Motion to Appoint Counsel without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/28/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that inmate, Tracy L. Stewart is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum 48 is discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion to supplement Settlement Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/6/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff, Tracy L. Stewart for Settlement Conference on 2/8/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/17. Case stayed(Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline, Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel, without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/30/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants; and ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Clerical Error signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/6/2017. Matthew Cate, V. Cortez, D. Duncan, P. Grant, K. Holland, R. Hoover, P. Matzen, K. Nowels, I. Alomari and M. Bryant terminated. (Jessen, A)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying Motions for screening and to supplement complaint with exhibits re 23 , 24 , 25 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That This Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Claims Against Defendants Serna, Langhardt, Carey, and Nixon, First Amendment Claim Against Defendant Langhardt, and That the Remaining Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/13/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 18 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/2/2015. (Jessen, A)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Case Status and ORDER Directing Clerk to Reflect Plaintiff's Request for Jury Trial on the Court's Docket signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/6/2015. (Jessen, A)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE re 12 AND DIRECTING CLERK TO SEND PLAINTIFF COPY OF DOCKET SHEET signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/3/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/9/2015. (Jessen, A)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/20/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Holland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Langhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Nowels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Matzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Alomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?