Windham v. Marin et al
Plaintiff: Charles W. Windham
Defendant: M. Marin, Raley, Dave Davies, Dan Uribe, J. Contreras, A. Capano, R. Rubio, Navarro, Shiver, Morales, Brett and Jeff Beard
Case Number: 1:2014cv01636
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's Opposition, Declaration in Support, and Supplemental Addendum to Opposition signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Regarding Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, with Prejudice; ORDER Vacating Evidentiary Hearing Set for May 10, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/15/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Directing Parties to Meet and Confer and Directing Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/9/2018. Defendants' Response due 4/13/2018. Plaintiff's Response due 4/20/2018. (Jessen, A)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Denying 142 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/28/18. (Gonzalez, R)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing on the Issue of Exhaustion, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/21/18. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Conference Regarding Setting of an Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/12/18. Wednesday, March 21, 2018 at 11:00 a.m..(Marrujo, C)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Adopting 136 Findings and Recommendations, Denying Defendants' 49 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Referring Matter for Evidentiary Hearing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/6/18. (Gonzalez, R)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 49 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT for Failure to Exhaust, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/31/18. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying Motion for Reconsideration re 134 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 100 Motion for Sanctions and Contempt; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; ORDER Denying Defendants' 105 Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or in the Alternative, Evidentiary Sanctions; ODER Directing Defendants to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment if any within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/14/2017. Reply due by 10/2/2017.(Flores, E)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 119 Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare for Telephonic Status Conference as Moot; ORDER DISCHARGING 123 Order to Shower Cause; ORDER RESETTING Telephonic Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/13/17. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Marrujo, C)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Sactions Should not be Imposed for Plaintiff's Refusal to Attend Telephonic Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/28/2017. (Flores, E)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/12/2017. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Flores, E)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Denying 102 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/06/2017. (Flores, E)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/01/2017. (Flores, E)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying Defendants' 89 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Surreply; ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 77 Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery; ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Serve Supplemental Responses to Discovery, without Objections, within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/15/2017. (Flores, E)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Objections to Court's Orders 51 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/13/17. (Hellings, J)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 50 Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/10/2017. (Flores, E)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b) 61 , 65 , 66 , 76 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/4/17: This matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Defendants' Second 66 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/18/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 11/7/2016.(Flores, E)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/4/16: 14-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 37 Request to Order Defendants to Submit a "Verified" Answer to the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/23/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition within Twenty-One Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/25/2015. (Flores, E)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 52 Motion Order Requiring Defendants' Counsel to Re-Serve Documents, for a Stay of Proceedings and for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/17/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge is DENIED, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/31/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/6/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/15/2015. (Flores, E)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/22/2015. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Amend; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Correct the Docket to Reflect True Name of Defendant 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/15: Plaintiff's request to amend an as yet unfiled amended complaint is DENIED. However, the Clerk of the Court is directed to correct the docket to reflect the true name of Defendant Raley as "W. Rasley". (Hellings, J)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Investigation, Court Hearings and Appointment of Counsel 18 , 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/9/15. (Verduzco, M)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants re 1 , 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/30/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-2336 DAD PC) to Fresno (1:14-cv-1636 BAM PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/17/2014. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windham v. Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Capano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?